Morningside Group Limited v. Azeb Clark

Plaintiff: Morningside Group Limited
Defendant: Azeb Clark
Case Number: 4:2016cv03871
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1127
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/18/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
October 13, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 12, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2016; Fact Discovery due by 4/28/2017; Motions due by 9/14/2017; Responses due by 10/5/2017; Replies due by 10/19/2017; Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. G illiam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2018 03:00 PM.; Jury /Jury Trial (5-day) set for 1/22/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/12/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morningside Group Limited v. Azeb Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morningside Group Limited
Represented By: Naomi Jane Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azeb Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?