John Marques v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: John Marques
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and NDEX WEST, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv03973
Filed: July 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 40 Wells Fargo Motion to Dismiss. The Court VACATES the hearing on motion set for December 20, 2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
October 13, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR for Mediation to be completed by 1/11/2017. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2017. Non-Expert Discovery due by 4/3/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2017 02: 00 PM. Jury Selection set for 8/7/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 3 Day Jury Trial set for 8/7/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Dispositive/Daubert Motion Hearing set for 5/16 /2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 7/21/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance hearing is set for 6/30 /2017 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/13/16. Compliance hearing re case set 11/4/16 at 9:01am. Joint filing by 10/28/16. Court VACATES Case Management Conference set 10/17/16 at 2:00pm. Request to appear by telephone 32 DENIED as moot. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
September 30, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 25 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
August 18, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as Moot 13 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing set for September 6, 2016 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
July 28, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/28/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Marques v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Marques
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Represented By: Rex John Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Represented By: Steven Robert Telles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX WEST, LLC
Represented By: James T. Lee
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?