Broadway Grill, Inc. v. Visa Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Broadway Grill, Inc.
Defendant: Visa Inc., Visa International Association and VISA U.S.A. Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv04040
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of New York. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 10, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding 47 Ninth Circuit Remand. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 07/10/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
October 17, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 32 Motion to Stay Remand Order Pending Appeal.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
September 28, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Temporarily Staying Remand Order and Setting Briefing Schedule for 32 MOTION to Stay Remand Order Pending Appeal of Defendants filed by Visa International Association, Visa Inc., VISA U.S.A. Inc.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 09/28/2016. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 27, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Renewed Motion to Remand.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
August 29, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 9 Motion to Remand; finding as moot 21 Request for Oral Argument. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
July 26, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 10 Motion to Shorten Time.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadway Grill, Inc. v. Visa Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Inc.
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Robert John Vizas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa International Association
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Robert John Vizas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISA U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Robert John Vizas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadway Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Nancy L. Fineman
Represented By: Gwendolyn R. Giblin
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?