Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv04068
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Action is dismissed with prejudice. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/29/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
October 19, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/19/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
August 3, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/3/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Mark W. Berry
Represented By: Neil M. Kliebenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Schmaeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?