Williams v. Perez et al

Plaintiff: Brandon T. Williams
Defendant: Hector Perez, Tim Jones, Ophelia Uribe and Theresa Muley
Case Number: 4:2016cv04143
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/22/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
August 31, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Plaintiff. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2017. Plaintiff must also file her opposition by 9/18/2017. Defendants' replies are due by 9/25/2017. ORDER CONTINUING HEARING on 45 , 48 Motions to Dismiss to 11/2/2017 11:0 0 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 12/5/2017 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/31/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
June 16, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 16 , 27 Motions to Dismiss due to the filing of the 37 second amended complaint; ORDER discharging the 31 5/22/17 order to show cause. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
April 20, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Leave to file her Second Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
March 3, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ISSUING SUMMONS. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/3/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon T. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ophelia Uribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Muley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?