Joseph Joshua Davis et al v. Comcast Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Joshua Davis, Penny Schoonover, Leon Gibson, Dustin Wayne Hagens, Raymond Agundez and Rafael Barajas, Jr.
Defendant: Comcast Corporation and Comcast of Contra Costa, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv04177
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 62 Discovery Letter Brief.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
August 4, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING TRANSFERRED CASES; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES IN RELATED CASES; DEFERRING RULING ON WHETHER STAYED CASES ARE RELATED; AND REQUIRING STATUS REPORT RE STAYED CASESJoint Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/4/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 26, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/26/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Joshua Davis et al v. Comcast Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Erin M. Doyle
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Represented By: Emilie Reeslund
Represented By: Stephen Luther Taeusch
Represented By: Troy A. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of Contra Costa, Inc.
Represented By: Erin M. Doyle
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Represented By: Emilie Reeslund
Represented By: Stephen Luther Taeusch
Represented By: Troy A. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Joshua Davis
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Schoonover
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Gibson
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Wayne Hagens
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Agundez
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Barajas, Jr.
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?