Paez, et al. v. Comcast Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: Hernan Paez, Nelson Adolf Burres, Jr., Bobby Holland, Roshun Wynne, Michael Ross, David Johnson, Jr., Nicholas Depriest, Michael Navarro, Clarita McBride, Curtis Parker, Duane Bateman, Christopher Dunham, William Tiller, Richard Chapman, Jr., Daniel Woodard, Darrin Brooks and William Thompson
Defendant: Comcast Corporation and Comcast of Contra Costa, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv04181
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 61 Discovery Letter Brief.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RELATING TRANSFERRED CASES; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES IN RELATED CASES; DEFERRING RULING ON WHETHER STAYED CASES ARE RELATED; AND REQUIRING STATUS REPORT RE STAYED CASES Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/4/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/26/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paez, et al. v. Comcast Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernan Paez
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Adolf Burres, Jr.
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Holland
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roshun Wynne
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ross
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Depriest
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Navarro
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarita McBride
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Parker
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Bateman
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dunham
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tiller
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Chapman, Jr.
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Woodard
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Brooks
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Thompson
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Fred W. Alvarez
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Represented By: Emilie Reeslund
Represented By: Stephen Luther Taeusch
Represented By: Troy A. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of Contra Costa, Inc.
Represented By: Fred W. Alvarez
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Represented By: Emilie Reeslund
Represented By: Stephen Luther Taeusch
Represented By: Troy A. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?