C&M Cafe v. Kinetic Farm, Inc.

Plaintiff: C&M Cafe
Defendant: Kinetic Farm, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv04342
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
November 18, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick re 21 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants defendants motion to dismiss the RICO claim with regards to defendants Byun and Lee and denies the motion to dismiss with regards in all other respects. Amended complaint due by 12/7/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 3, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Stipulation. Case Management Conference continued to 11/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/3/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016) Modified on 11/3/2016 to correct dates (jmdS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C&M Cafe v. Kinetic Farm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C&M Cafe
Represented By: Shafiel Ahmed Karim
Represented By: Kevin Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinetic Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Grant P. Fondo
Represented By: Laurel A Kilgour
Represented By: Michael T Lucey
Represented By: Brian Maschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?