James R Bechtold v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: James R. Bechtold
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv04383
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 32 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/19/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
April 25, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/22/2017 AT 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 11, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Modify the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James R Bechtold v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Bechtold
Represented By: Scott Ethan Calvert
Represented By: Robert John McKennon
Represented By: David Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Sean Patrick Nalty
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?