Clardy et al v. Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC

Plaintiff: Gail Clardy and Jennifer Rose
Defendant: Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv04385
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PERMITTING MAXIMILLIAN CASILLAS TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS filed by Gail Clardy, Jennifer Rose. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 17, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 5, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PINNACLE FOODS GROUP, LLC'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 13 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 16 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 1, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 28 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, FOR CHANGING TIME OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TRANSFER HEARINGS, AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Gail Clardy, Jennifer Rose. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016).
October 11, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR CHANGING TIME OF DEADLINES AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clardy et al v. Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Clardy
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Lopatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rose
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Lopatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC
Represented By: Paul B. LaScala
Represented By: Mayela C Montenegro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?