Hroch v. Prudential Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Tamara Hroch
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 4:2016cv04418
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 19, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL Re Docket No. 39 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/19/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
February 15, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Stipulation TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
November 21, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Stipulation Regarding Standard of Review, ADR and Case Deadlines. Cross Motions due by 12/16/2016.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 3, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hroch v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Hroch
Represented By: Scott D. Kalkin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?