Elizalde v. Muniz

Petitioner: Gamaliel Elizalde
Respondent: William Muniz
Case Number: 4:2016cv04607
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to 17 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 8/21/2017. Reply due by 8/28/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/08/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
November 17, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to 7 MOTION to Stay . Stipulation and Proposed Order re: Motion to Stay due by 12/23/2016. Responses/Opposition due by 1/6/2017. Replies due by 1/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline S. Corley on 11/17/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
September 2, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/2/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizalde v. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gamaliel Elizalde
Represented By: Robert Joseph Beles
Represented By: Joseph Lanting Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?