Diller v. Ditech Financial, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Abigail Diller
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC and Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss LLP
Case Number: 4:2016cv04755
Filed: August 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/22/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
July 13, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TENTATIVELY GRANTING MOTION OF THE MELLEN LAW FIRM TO BE RELIEVED AS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AND NOTICE TO UNREPRESENTED PARTY re 49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Abigail Diller. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/13/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
April 26, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 35 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing currently set for May 16, 2017 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
August 19, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.Opposition to OSC filed by noon 8/26/16. Reply filed 8/29/16. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/1/2016 08:00 AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/19/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diller v. Ditech Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Diller
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Represented By: Xiyi Fu
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?