Laine v. State of California et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Laine
Defendant: State of California and Alameda County Department of Child Support Services
Case Number: 4:2016cv04813
Filed: August 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/17/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
October 13, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing Case; denying as moot 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 14 Motion for Hearing. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
September 22, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/22/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
August 22, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES: 4:16-cv-04813-DMR Laine v. State of California, et al and 3:16-cv-02565-CRB Laine v. Dutton, et al. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/22/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laine v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Laine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Department of Child Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?