Adams v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Junis Adams
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC and Trans Union , LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv04849
Filed: August 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 77 Stipulation Re: Dismissal of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Entire Case. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 6, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 71 Stipulation To Dismiss Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only With Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
May 17, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/17/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 11, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 60 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Hoyland. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
February 22, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 54 Stipulation To Continue Mediation Deadline. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
December 1, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 49 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 28, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 44 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/28/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 23, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE. Show Cause Response due by 11/29/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/23/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 16, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference.. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 10, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 36 Motion to Appear by Telephone For Lead Counsel To Participate In Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582- 6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junis Adams
Represented By: Octavio Cardona-Loya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Smith Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union , LLC
Represented By: Andrew Michael Lehmann
Represented By: Colin Christopher Poling
Represented By: David James Streza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?