Weaver v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Annie G Weaver
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., NDEX West, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 4:2016cv04907
Filed: August 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.The case management conference is continued from June 16, 2017, to August 25, 2017. The parties shall file, no later than August 18, 2017, an updated Joint Case Management Statement, in which the parties set forth, inter alia, a proposed trial schedule, including proposed deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
May 31, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. To the extent Wells Fargo seeks dismissal of Count I, the motion is granted. To the extent Wells Fargo seeks dismissal of Count II, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/31/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 16, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING THIRD JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE. The mediation deadline is extended from June 13, 2017, to August 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/16/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 5, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The May 12, 2017 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
April 17, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE. The mediation deadline is extended from May 13, 2017 to June 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/17/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017) Modified on 4/17/2017 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE. The mediation deadline is extended from April 13, 2017 to May 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/11/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 5, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to June 16, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than June 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 27, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
February 24, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Should plaintiff wish to file a Second Amended Complaint, she shall file such pleading no later than March 13, 2017. The Case Management Conference is hereby continued to April 21, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 20, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 13, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 27, 2017, to March 3, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than February 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
November 28, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 1, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LIMITED LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counts I and III are dismissed without leave to amend and Counts II and IV are dismissed with leave to amend. Should Weaver wish to file a First Amended Complaint, Weaver shall file such pleading no later than November 18, 2016. The Case Management Conference is continued from December 2, 2016, to January 27, 2017, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 1, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
September 28, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER DEEMING DEFENDANTS' MOTION UNOPPOSED. The Court will afford plaintiff the opportunity to file his opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss by September 30, 2016. Defendants' reply is due no later than October 7, 2016. The Court sets aside its order vacating the November 4, 2016 hearing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 26, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. Plaintiff has not filed opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of the motion, the Court deems the matter suitable for decision thereon and vacates the hearing scheduled for November 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/26/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 14, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court IGNORE - ORDER FILED IN INCORRECT CASE. (Filed on 9/14/2016) Modified on 9/14/2016 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/07/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie G Weaver
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel A Armstrong
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, LLC
Represented By: James T. Lee
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Daniel A Armstrong
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?