Bell v. Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau et al

Plaintiff: Marcus Bell
Defendant: Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau, Transunion, Experian and Equifax
Case Number: 4:2016cv04951
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/20/2017 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/9/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
February 28, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. ONLY by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 43 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
December 21, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/21/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau
Represented By: Ralph L. Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion
Represented By: David James Streza
Represented By: Justin T. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?