Nardolillo v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al

Plaintiff: Gary N. Nardolillo
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and MTC Financial Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv05365
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/30/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
April 26, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 31 MOTION TO DISMISS. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/26/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
December 1, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 22 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES. Case Management Conference continued to 2/21/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/1/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nardolillo v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary N. Nardolillo
Represented By: Clarisse Jien-Yee Chung
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc.
Represented By: Jerett T Yan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?