Domingo-Jimenez v. Johnson

Defendant: Jeh C. Johnson, Loretta M. Lynch, Thomas J. Decker and Steven L. Durfor
Petitioner: Carlos Romeo Domingo-Jimenez
Case Number: 4:2016cv05431
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 8:1105
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS HABEAS PETITION [re 28 MOTION Consideration of Jorjani Declaration filed by Carlos Romeo Domingo-Jimenez, 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Steven L. Durfor, Loretta M. Lynch, Jeh C. Johnson, Thomas J. Decker]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/19/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
November 4, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 6 Motion for TRO. Motions due by 11/21/2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
October 31, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/31/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
September 29, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 . Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 28, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERING SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Responses due by 10/7/2016. Replies due by 10/11/2016. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/28/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Domingo-Jimenez v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Romeo Domingo-Jimenez
Represented By: Raha Jorjani
Represented By: Brendon DeWayne Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh C. Johnson
Represented By: Erica Blachman Hitchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta M. Lynch
Represented By: Erica Blachman Hitchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Decker
Represented By: Erica Blachman Hitchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L. Durfor
Represented By: Erica Blachman Hitchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?