David Guerra v. Linear Technology Corp. et al

Plaintiff: David Guerra
Defendant: Linear Technology Corp., Robert H. Swanson, Jr., Lothar Maier, Arthur C. Agnos, John J. Gordon, David S. Lee, Richard M. Moley and Thomas S. Volpe
Case Number: 4:2016cv05514
Filed: September 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/24/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 13, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by David Guerra. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/13/2016. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 6, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Deadline to Respond to 19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/6/2016. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 4, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 8 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Guerra v. Linear Technology Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Guerra
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Barbara Ann Rohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linear Technology Corp.
Represented By: David J. Berger
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Swanson, Jr.
Represented By: David J. Berger
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lothar Maier
Represented By: David J. Berger
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur C. Agnos
Represented By: David J. Berger
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Gordon
Represented By: David J. Berger
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Lee
Represented By: David J. Berger
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Moley
Represented By: David J. Berger
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas S. Volpe
Represented By: David J. Berger
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?