Peter Schuman et al v. Microchip Technology Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Peter Schuman and William Coplin
Defendant: Microchip Technology Incorporated, Atmel Corporation and Atmel Corporation U.S. Severance Guarantee Benefit Program
Case Number: 4:2016cv05544
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 36 Stipulation Enlarging Plaintiff's Time to Respond to Docket No. 33 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 1, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
December 22, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation to Withdraw Defs' Motion to Dismiss and for Pltfs to file Amended Complaint; Joint Request to Vacate CMC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 7, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Schmidtke, Mark. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 6, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Schmidtke, Mark. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
November 30, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to 17 Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peter Schuman et al v. Microchip Technology Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Schuman
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Coplin
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microchip Technology Incorporated
Represented By: Mark Gerard Kisicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atmel Corporation
Represented By: Mark Gerard Kisicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atmel Corporation U.S. Severance Guarantee Benefit Program
Represented By: Mark Gerard Kisicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?