Smith v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mitchell Smith
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Bank of America, National Association and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2016cv05699
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 for dismissal of defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/3/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
April 24, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/8/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/1/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/24/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 14, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 58 to dismiss Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/14/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
January 20, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for dismissal of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/20/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Smith
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Anthony Q. Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Gregory Lane Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?