Rubirosa Vizcaino v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rubirosa Vizcaino
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Vons Credit Union
Case Number: 4:2016cv05703
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Parties hereto, by their counsel, having advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement of this cause,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this cause be dismissed with prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto sh all certify to this Court, with proof of service of a copy to opposing counsel, within forty five (45) days from the date of this order, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/11/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Combined Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing reset for 4/24/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/13/2017. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying 20 Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/31/17. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubirosa Vizcaino v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubirosa Vizcaino
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Valerie Michelle McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vons Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?