Miller v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Miller and Joseph Miller
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., USAA Federal Savings Bank, Equifax, Inc., Ditech Financial, LLC and Real Time Resolutions
Case Number: 4:2016cv05710
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 5/21/2017 granting #67 Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (tnS) (Filed on 5/21/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal of defendant Equifax, Inc. filed by Joseph Miller. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 19, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 67 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Joseph Miller. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 66 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Equifax, Inc. filed by Joseph Miller. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 2, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Benjamin Chung Lee (Lee, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re #62 Notice of settlement with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Joseph Miller, #63 Notice of settlement with Equifax, Inc. filed by Joseph Miller. Dismissal or Statement due by 5/19/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 12, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE by Joseph Miller of settlement with Equifax, Inc. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
April 12, 2017 Filing 62 NOTICE by Joseph Miller of settlement with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #60 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for dismissal of Defendant Ditech Financial, LLC filed by Joseph Miller. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 60 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Ditech Financial, LLC filed by Joseph Miller. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS FOR CONSOLIDATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part #34 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 9, 2017 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 3/9/2017 re #34 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Total Time in Court: 22 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/9/2017).
March 3, 2017 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearings as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss Experian Information Solutions, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, #36 MOTION to Dismiss, #33 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Due to a change in the Court's availability, the hearings previously set for 3/30/2017 are continued to 4/13/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER SETTING HEARINGS ON PENDING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE AND MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #34 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss Experian Information Solutions, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, #36 MOTION to Dismiss, #33 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 24, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by David Denton Doak (Doak, David) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #50 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER (for dismissal of Defendant USAA FSB) filed by Joseph Miller. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 20, 2017 Filing 53 Statement re #47 Opposition/Response to Motion; --Asserting Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Leave to Amend the Complaint filed by Ditech Financial, LLC. (Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 20, 2017 Filing 52 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING RE #26 Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint. The motion hearing set for 3/2/2017 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 20, 2017 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference set for 2/8/2017 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant USAA FSB filed by Joseph Miller. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 49 Statement of Intent re: Motion to Dismiss by Equifax, Inc., Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Motion to Dismiss by Ditech Financial, LLC re #48 Order filed by Joseph Miller. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Equifax, Inc., #34 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ditech Financial, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 19, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 13, 2017 Filing 47 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #36 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJoseph Miller. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 46 REPLY (re #34 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Jackson, Celia) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 45 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TERMINATING MOTION AS MOOT. The Case Management Conference currently set for 1/18/2017 is continued to 2/8/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The #42 Motion to Appear By telephone is terminated as moot. Any motion to appear by telephone at the 2/8/2017 conference should be made no sooner than seven days prior to the hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 44 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Joseph Miller. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 10, 2017 Filing 43 REPLY (re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed byEquifax, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 9, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Equifax, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant Equifax Inc.'s Motion to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference)(Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 9, 2017 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. The Motion Hearing currently set for 1/26/2017 is continued to 2/9/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. All other deadlines remain as previously set. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 40 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 1/3/2017 with Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 5, 2017 Filing 39 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #34 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed by Joseph Miller. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 38 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #33 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) filed by Joseph Miller. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 30, 2016 Filing 37 Request for Judicial Notice re #36 MOTION to Dismiss filed byDitech Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Related document(s) #36 ) (Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 30, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ditech Financial, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/13/2017. Replies due by 1/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 29, 2016 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Equifax, Inc. (Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 22, 2016 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/5/2017. Replies due by 1/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C, #5 Appendix D)(Jackson, Celia) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 22, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Equifax, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/5/2017. Replies due by 1/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Equifax Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 32 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Tuesday, January 3, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. to 11:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 15, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Jackson, Celia) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 14, 2016 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jackson, Celia) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (of Defendant Real Time Resolutions) by Joseph Miller (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 6, 2016 Filing 28 REPLY (re #26 Experian Information Solutions, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Jackson, Celia) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
November 29, 2016 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Experian Information Solutions, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint) filed by Joseph Miller. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 26 Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/29/2016. Replies due by 12/6/2016. (Attachments: #(1)[Proposed] Order)(Jackson, Celia) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 25 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Ditech Financial, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Green Tree Investment Holdings II LLC, Corporate Parent Green Tree Credit Solutions LLC, Corporate Parent Walter Management Holding Company LLC, Corporate Parent Green Tree Servicing Corp. for Ditech Financial, LLC. (Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 3, 2016 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING #23 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint. The parties have stipulated to extend the time to respond to the complaint. Per Civil Local rule 6-1(a), "Parties may stipulate in writing, without a Court order, to extend the time within which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint...." The stipulation at ECF No. 23 does not need approval by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Initial Complaint filed by Equifax, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Extending Defendant Equifax, Inc.'s Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #18 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Ditech Financial, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 31, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by USAA Federal Savings Bank identifying Corporate Parent USAA Federal Savings Bank for USAA Federal Savings Bank.; --Corporate Disclosure Statement (McLay, Robert) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Trial Demand filed by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Kastan, Joshua) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina Jill McClendon (McClendon, Regina) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending time to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint filed by Ditech Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 25, 2016 Filing 17 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Jackson, Celia) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Miller. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 10/11/2016, answer due 11/1/2016. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Miller. Ditech Financial, LLC served on 10/11/2016, answer due 11/1/2016. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Miller. Real Time Resolutions served on 10/11/2016, answer due 11/1/2016. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Miller. USAA Federal Savings Bank served on 10/10/2016, answer due 10/31/2016. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. re Electronic Filing Error, (Jackson, Celia) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on October 21, 2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 21, 2016 Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Names of Interested Parties were not entered.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #7 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 20, 2016 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Jackson, Celia) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 20, 2016 Filing 7 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc. for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Jackson, Celia) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ditech Financial, LLC, Equifax, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Real Time Resolutions, USAA Federal Savings Bank. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2017. Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/20/2016. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE counsel to resubmit current civil cover sheet. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 5, 2016 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ditech Financial, LLC, Equifax, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Real Time Resolutions, USAA Federal Savings Bank, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-10828608). Filed by Joseph Miller. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Miller
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Celia M. Jackson
Represented By: David Denton Doak
Represented By: David L. Wallach
Represented By: Benjamin Chung Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: Anastasia M. Sullivan
Represented By: Robert Stewart McLay
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Kastan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Xiyi Fu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?