Lopez v. Allstate Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: Maria Lopez
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv05841
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Pursuant to stipulation, the action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/03/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
January 3, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties agree to participate in Early Neutral Evaluation no later than 120 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/03/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
October 28, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR JANUARY 23, 2017 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. All parties shall appear by telephone at the January 23, 2017 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 17, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/17/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 13, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES RE: ELECTRONIC FILING OF DOCUMENTS. On or before October 24, 2016, counsel for plaintiff shall comply with the local rules by registering to become an ECF user. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/13/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lopez
Represented By: Robert Isadore Beckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jeffry Butler
Represented By: Elizabeth Throne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?