X One, Inc. v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: X One, Inc.
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv06050
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER re: Motions to Seal: 249 , 257 , 260 , 268 , 271 , 276 , 291 , 293 , 296 , 298 , 300 , 314 , 318 , 320 , 322 , 332 , 334 , 337 . (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 299 Uber's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying as Moot X One's Motion for Summary Judgment 294 ; Denying as Moot 250 , 252 , 258 Motions to Strike; and Denying as Moot 292 , 297 , 301 Daubert Motions to Exclude Expert Evidence. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 279 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 16, 2019. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen denying 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 FURTHER ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES' JUNE 7, 2019 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER [ECF 184]. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION REGARDING THE PARTIES' JUNE 7, 2019 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER 184 by Judge Susan van Keulen. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER UNSEALING ORDER GRANTING UBER'S MAY 10, 2019 MOTION TO COMPEL A FURTHER RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORY NO. 18 (ECF 154; ECF 155). (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR JUNE 6, 2019 HEARING RE UBER'S MOTION TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS; PRELIMINARY ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE (ECF 153). (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER RE REDACTION OF ORDER GRANTING UBERS MAY 10, 2019 MOTION TO COMPEL A FURTHER RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORY NO. 18 (ECF 154). (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen granting in part and denying in part 145 Discovery Letter Brief regarding Depositions. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen finding as moot 136 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 139 Discovery Letter Brief. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER CONSTRUING DISPUTED CLAIM TERMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,798,593 AND 8,798,647. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 18, 2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS, re Dkt. No. 53 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/17/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying 24 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: X One, Inc. v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X One, Inc.
Represented By: Doris Johnson Hines
Represented By: Jacob Adam Schroeder
Represented By: Jeffrey C Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Bovich
Represented By: Doyle Johnson
Represented By: Christine Marie Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?