Greenberg v. Ameriprise Financial et al
Plaintiff: Rick M Greenberg
Defendant: RiverSource Life Insurance Company, Medical Consultants Network, Howard Belfer and Ameriprise Financial
Case Number: 4:2016cv06248
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/6/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS TWO DEFENDANTS AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE [re 30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract filed by RiverSource Life Insurance Company, Ameriprise Financial]. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 3/29/2017. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/17/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/15/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenberg v. Ameriprise Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick M Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RiverSource Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jordan S. Altura
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Consultants Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Belfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial
Represented By: Jordan S. Altura
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?