Rara v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Rara
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Bank of America, National Association and Schools First Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 4:2016cv06376
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Schools First Federal Credit Union. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 06/30/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 29, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 06/29/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
March 20, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 24 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend; administratively terminating 46 Motion to Dismiss. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
January 20, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 14 Motion to Consolidate Cases and Setting Hearing Date for Motion to Dismiss.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rara v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rara
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Raymond WIlliam Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schools First Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?