Rodriguez v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marco Rodriguez
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2016cv06380
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 for dismissal of defendant Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC filed by Marco Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal of defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Marco Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/16/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date for Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s and Equifax, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and [Proposed] Order filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date for Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s and Equifax, Inc.'s Motion to Di smiss and [Proposed] Order, 49 MOTION to Dismiss , 19 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 53 to dismiss Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Marco Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/18/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 Second Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/27/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Rodriguez
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Ivette Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?