McFarlane v. Freitas
Plaintiff: Alan Bruce McFarlane, III
Defendant: Stephen Freitas
Case Number: 4:2016cv06401
Filed: November 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Alan Bruce McFarlane, III, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/16/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/27/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; adopting Report and Recommendations as to 14 Report and Recommendations.; denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarlane v. Freitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Bruce McFarlane, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Freitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?