Benton v. Clarity Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Joyce Benton
Defendant: Clarity Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv06583
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The discovery cutoff (Phase One)is extended to November 24, 2017. The expert disclosure deadline is extended to October 13, 2017, and the rebuttal expert disclosure deadline is extende d to October 27, 2017. The expert discovery cutoff is extended to October 27, 2017. The summary judgment motion filing deadline is extended to December 15, 2017, the deadline to file opposition to any summary judgment motion is extended to January 12, 2018, and the deadline to file a reply is extended to January 22, 2018. The summary judgment hearing is continued from January 12, 2018, to February 16, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. The Further Case Management Conference is continued from March 16, 2018, to April 13, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/25/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 1, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties' stipulation to participate in private mediation on October 16, 2017 is approved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/01/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
April 17, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/17/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
March 20, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. All parties shall appear telephonically at the case management conference on March 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 10, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017) Modified on 3/10/2017 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of David M. Gettings is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/06/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
March 3, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing scheduled for March 10, 2017, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/03/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
February 13, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING. Per the parties' stipulation, the hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss is continued to March 10, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
January 27, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFORDING PLAINTIFF OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SURREPLY; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff may file, no later than February 6, 2017, a surreply of no more than seven pages in length. The hearing on the motion is continued to February 17, 2017. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to March 24, 2017. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than March 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 24, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. To the extent Benton bases the First Cause of Action on the ground that Clarity violated 15 U.S.C. 1681(c)(1)(B) by disclosing her consumer report to entities lackin g a permissible purpose, the motion is denied. As to all other claims asserted in the complaint, the motion is granted and said claims are severed and remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California, in and for the County of Alameda. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
December 14, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Gregory A. Murray is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/14/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 12, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of James M. Pietz is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/12/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
November 22, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE. STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT CLARITY SERVICES, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than December 12, 2016. If defendant file s a responsive pleading other than an answer, plaintiff shall file an opposition to said pleading no later than January 9, 2017, and defendant shall file a reply no later than January 16, 2017. If plaintiff files a motion to remand the action, plain tiff shall file said motion no later than December 14, 2016. Defendant shall file an opposition to said motion no later than January 6, 2017, and plaintiff shall file a reply no later than January 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/22/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benton v. Clarity Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Benton
Represented By: Mark Andrew Chavez
Represented By: Gregory A. Murray
Represented By: James Pietz
Represented By: Christian Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarity Services, Inc.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: Sheila Pham
Represented By: Ronald Irvin Raether, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?