California Restaurant Association v. City of Emeryville

Plaintiff: California Restaurant Association
Defendant: City of Emeryville
Case Number: 4:2016cv06660
Filed: November 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Stipulation and proposed Order filed by Unite Here Local 2850, City of Emeryville. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
February 10, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by California Restaurant Association. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
February 2, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO INTERVENE filed by Unite Here Local 2850. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 10, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by California Restaurant Association. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Restaurant Association v. City of Emeryville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Restaurant Association
Represented By: Lukas Jon Clary
Represented By: Charles L. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Emeryville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?