Ajaelo v. Madden

Petitioner: Jideofor Ajaelo
Respondent: Raymond Madden
Case Number: 4:2016cv06962
Filed: December 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/24/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
February 9, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Hon. William Alsup granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
December 8, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The respondent must file an answer to the petition or a dispositive motion by 2/7/2017. The petitioner may file a traverse by March 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/8/2016. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajaelo v. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jideofor Ajaelo
Represented By: Robert Joseph Beles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raymond Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?