Glaser et al v. Nationstar Mortgage

Plaintiff: Franklin Glaser and Victoria Glaser
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and NBS Default Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv07245
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-1, Mortgage Loan Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-1; Viet Nguyen, and Does 1-100, Inclusive, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/21/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
May 9, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss.The court vacates the May 18, 2017 hearing. The court grants in part the defendants' motion to dismiss. As described in the attached order, the court grants the plaintiffs leave to amend the complaint within 14 days of this order. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 5, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/5/2017. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaser et al v. Nationstar Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBS Default Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Glaser
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Glaser
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?