Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC v. Richard P. Sax

Plaintiff: Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC
Defendant: Richard P Sax and Law Offices of Richard Sax
Case Number: 4:2017cv00257
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the 8/29/2017 case management conference. Counsel to personally arrange the appearance with CourtCall prior to the hearing date. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 1, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Defendants' 43 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the 8/29/17 case management conference. Counsel shall personally arrange the telephonic appearance with CourtCalla paid, private servicein advance of the hearing date. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 27, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 34 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer. Defendant is required to E-FILE the amended document. ORDER terminating 39 Motion to Appear by Telephone as moot. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
May 22, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 20 4/25/17 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/22/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
April 25, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Plaintiff for not appearing at the 4/25/2017 case management conference. Show Cause Response due by 5/2/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/25/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 6, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC and Richard Sax, et al. filed by Richard P Sax, Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC, Law Offices of Richard Sax, Case referred to early neutral evaluation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/6/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC v. Richard P. Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC
Represented By: Kira Ann Schlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard P Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Richard Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?