Jessilyn Manimbao v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jessilyn Manimbao
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, Inc. and First Electronic Bank
Case Number: 4:2017cv00394
Filed: January 25, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (for dismissal of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) filed by Jessilyn Manimbao. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
May 1, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (for dismissal of Defendant First Electronic Bank) filed by Jessilyn Manimbao.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 1, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 27, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by TransUnion, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
March 7, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jessilyn Manimbao v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessilyn Manimbao
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferguson
Represented By: David James Streza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Electronic Bank
Represented By: Taylor Robert Steinbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?