Bennett v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Valinda Bennett
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2017cv00506
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
March 20, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
February 8, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/8/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 6, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Motions due by 2/9/2017. Responses due by 2/23/2017. Replies due by 3/2/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/6/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valinda Bennett
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Chung Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?