California Union Square L.P. v. Saks & Company LLC.
Plaintiff: California Union Square L.P.
Defendant: Saks & Company LLC.
Case Number: 4:2017cv01765
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2017 Filing 19 Acknowledgement from San Francisco Superior Court re remand documents. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
May 24, 2017 Filing 18 Sent certified copies of #17 Order and docket entries to San Francisco Superior Court. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #6 Motion to Remand. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for July 11, 2017, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by July 5, 2017. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RELATING CASE to 16-cv-4043-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/18/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. #15 FOR CORRECT ORDER.***ORDER RELATING CASE to 16-cv-4043-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/18/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017) Modified on 5/18/2017 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2017 Filing 13 REPLY (re #6 MOTION to Remand ) filed byCalifornia Union Square L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration William A. Molinski ISO Petitioner California Union Square L.P.'s Reply ISO Motion for Remand, #2 Declaration Bernard J. Angelo ISO Petitioner California Union Square L.P.'s Reply ISO Motion for Remand)(Molinski, William) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 5, 2017 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION to Remand ) filed bySaks & Company LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony J. Oliva)(Oliva, Anthony) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
April 26, 2017 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #6 MOTION to Remand .Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Remand . (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 26, 2017 Filing 10 Renotice motion hearing re #6 MOTION to Remand PETITIONER CALIFORNIA UNION SQUARE L.P.'S AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REMAND filed byCalifornia Union Square L.P.. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Molinski, William) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Seeborg's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3.Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/25/17. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 21, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand filed by California Union Square L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 5/5/2017. Replies due by 5/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petitioner California Union Square L.P.'s Motion for Remand, #2 Declaration of William Molinski, #3 Exhibit A-S to Declaration of William Molinski, #4 Proposed Order)(Molinski, William) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
April 13, 2017 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Saks & Company LLC... (Dennis, Marissa) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 4 Response Opposition to petition to confirm arbitration award bySaks & Company LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A - O to Oliva Declaration, #5 Exhibit P - W to Oliva Declaration)(Oliva, Anthony) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 5, 2017 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2017. Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 30, 2017 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/13/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
March 30, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CPF-17-515528. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-11275455). Filed by Saks & Company LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dennis, Marissa) (Filed on 3/30/2017) Modified on 4/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Union Square L.P. v. Saks & Company LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Union Square L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saks & Company LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?