Matoza v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Henry Matoza, Jr.
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc., Thor Industries, Inc., Ford Motor Company and Automobile Protection Corporation
Case Number: 4:2017cv01971
Filed: April 10, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/02/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 14, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/14/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 6, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS APCO HOLDINGS, LLC AND ONTARIO TEACHERS' PENSION PLAN BOARD'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND. The September 15, 2017 hearings are vacated, and the First Amended Complaint ("FAC&q uot;) is dismissed, to the extent it alleges claims against defendants APCO Holdings, LLC and Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. If Matoza wishes to proceed against said defendants, he shall file, no later than September 26, 2017, a Second A mended Complaint, alleging therein facts sufficient to support a finding of personal jurisdiction over said defendants. Matoza may not, however, add any new parties or claims without first obtaining leave of court. If Matoza does not wish to file a Second Amended Complaint within the time provided, the instant action will proceed on the claims in the FAC against the remaining defendants. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/06/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 1, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS APCO HOLDINGS, INC. AND ONTARIO TEACHERS' PENSION PLAN TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/01/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 15, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON DEFENDANT WARRANTY SUPPORT SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.The hearing on Warranty Support Services, LLC's motion to compel arbitration is advanced from S eptember 8, 2017, to August 25, 2017. The Case Management Conference is continued from August 25, 2017, to November 17, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than November 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/15/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
June 28, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; VACATING HEARING. Plaintiff shall file his proposed First Amended Complaint no later than July 5, 2017. The hearing scheduled for July 28, 2017, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/28/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
May 25, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from August 11, 2017, to August 25, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than August 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/25/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 16, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/16/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matoza v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Matoza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Industries, Inc.
Represented By: William Louis Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Douglas
Represented By: Amir M. Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobile Protection Corporation
Represented By: Phil John Montoya, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?