Sustainable Ranching Partners, Inc. v. Bering Pacific Ranches Limited et al

Plaintiff: Sustainable Ranching Partners, Inc.
Defendant: Bering Pacific Ranches Limited and Patrick Harvie
Case Number: 4:2017cv02323
Filed: April 25, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Tehama
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURSDICTION OR IMPROPER VENUE, GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, AND DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 11/17/2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
August 31, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Re: Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Related Dates filed by Sustainable Ranching Partners, Inc.. Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 31, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
July 6, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Bering Pacific Ranches Limited, Patrick Harvie filed by Patrick Harvie, Bering Pacific Ranches Limited. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sustainable Ranching Partners, Inc. v. Bering Pacific Ranches Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sustainable Ranching Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Edward Merrill
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Represented By: William C. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bering Pacific Ranches Limited
Represented By: Craig C Crockett
Represented By: Ryan A. Lewis
Represented By: Dean Allen Morehous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Harvie
Represented By: Craig C Crockett
Represented By: Ryan A. Lewis
Represented By: Dean Allen Morehous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?