Briski v. Hersey

Plaintiff: Zana Briski
Defendant: Dorothy Hersey
Case Number: 4:2017cv02675
Filed: May 9, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Zana Briski against Dorothy Hersey Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/5/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
September 26, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT APPLICATION re 28 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Zana Briski. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/26/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
June 29, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 26, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Zana Briski Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/26/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briski v. Hersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zana Briski
Represented By: Nicholas A. Carlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Hersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?