Eolas Technologies Incorporated v. Amazon.com, Inc.

Plaintiff: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Miscellaneous: David Keyzer
Mediator: David Folsom
Movant: Latham & Watkins LLP
Case Number: 4:2017cv03022
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2017 405 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 404 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Court Deadlines Other than those Set Forth in the Court's September 27, 2017 Order filed by Amazon.com Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 26, 2017 402 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 401 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Amazon.com Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 26, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 20, 2017 395 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 390 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Amazon.com Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 11, 2017 389 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 388 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Page Limits for Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition/Cross-Motion filed by Amazon.com Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
August 24, 2017 385 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 253 Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins as Counsel for Amazon.com, Inc. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 8, 2017 379 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 375 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Early Summary Judgment and Claim Construction Reconsideration Briefing Schedules (Corrected) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/ 31/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Hearing on summary judgment motions set for 12/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
June 21, 2017 370 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 369 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Rescheduling July 5, 2017 Case Management Conference for August 2, 2017 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 15, 2017 368 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 367 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Eolas Technologies Incorporated and Amazon.com, Inc. filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 15, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eolas Technologies Incorporated v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Stephanie M. Adams Ryan
Represented By: Joshua Wright Budwin
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: John Bruce Campbell, Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey Patton Culbertson
Represented By: John Franklin Garvish, II
Represented By: Kevin Hess
Represented By: James Elroy Quigley
Represented By: Kelly Tidwell
Represented By: Craig N. Tolliver
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Blake Richard Davis
Represented By: Elana Nightingale Dawson
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Richard Gregory Frenkel
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Homrig
Represented By: Grant E. Kinsel
Represented By: Joseph H Lee
Represented By: Douglas E. Lumish
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Elana Nightingale Dawson
Represented By: Graham E. Phillips
Represented By: Jeffrey Randall Roeser
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Joshua Thane
Represented By: Nicholas Howard Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: David Folsom
Represented By: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Latham & Watkins LLP
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?