Castro et al v. ABM Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Marley Castro and Lucia Marmolejo
Defendant: ABM Industries, Inc., ABM Onsite Services - West, Inc., ABM Services, Inc., ABM Janitorial Services - Northern California, Inc., ABM Janitorial Services, Inc. and ABM Janitorial Services-Southwest, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv03026
Filed: May 25, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2018 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL AND ALTERNATIVELY MODIFYING CLASS DEFINITION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying 58 Motion to Compel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
April 25, 2018 69 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/25/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
January 26, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 31 Motion to Certify Class; granting 34 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
October 19, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 24 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro et al v. ABM Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marley Castro
Represented By: Genevieve Lise Casey
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Chad A. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Marmolejo
Represented By: Genevieve Lise Casey
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Chad A. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Theane Evangelis Kapur
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Onsite Services - West, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Theane Evangelis Kapur
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Services, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Theane Evangelis Kapur
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Janitorial Services - Northern California, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Theane Evangelis Kapur
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Theane Evangelis Kapur
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Janitorial Services-Southwest, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Theane Evangelis Kapur
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?