Francisca Moralez v. 2600 Broadway Associates, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Defendant: 2600 Broadway Associates, LLC and Peet's Operating Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv03124
Filed: May 31, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/12/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
August 14, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DATE re 14 Stipulation, filed by 2600 Broadway Associates, LLC, Peet's Operating Company, Inc., Francisca Moralez. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/14/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
June 26, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DATE TO ANSWER re 12 Stipulation filed by 2600 Broadway Associates, LLC, Peet's Operating Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/26/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francisca Moralez v. 2600 Broadway Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2600 Broadway Associates, LLC
Represented By: Michael Brett Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peet's Operating Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brett Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?