Jensen v. Natrol, LLC
Plaintiff: Jaime Jensen
Defendant: Natrol, LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv03193
Filed: June 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 172 Request for dismissal. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting as modified 169 request to vacate class certification deadlines and set deadline for motion for preliminary approval. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/8/2020. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 166 Stipulated request to stay schedule for 30 days. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting as modified 164 Stipulated request for third amended scheduling order. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 GENERAL ORDER FOR PENDING CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE CHHABRIA. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/30/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/21/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Denying 61 and 78 Motions for Summary Judgment, and Denying 80 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on July 25, 2019. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 17-cv-1862-RS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/6/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. Natrol, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Jensen
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natrol, LLC
Represented By: Kahn Abrahm Scolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?