Gray v. Shulkin

Plaintiff: Rochelle Gray
Defendant: David J. Shulkin
Case Number: 4:2017cv03973
Filed: July 17, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 43 Stipulation for Protective Order for Standard Litigation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
January 31, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 Stipulation Re Docket No. 37 . Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/22/2018; Opening Reports due by 7/6/2018; Rebuttal Reports due by 7/20/2018; Close of Expert Discovery due by 8/17/2018; Dispositive Motion due by 9/6/2018; Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial (3-5 day) set for 12/17/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 22, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 32 Defendant's administrative motion to continue the case management conference. (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Shulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Shulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?