Zeiger et al v. WellPet LLC et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Zeiger, Danz Doggie Daytrips and Amy Freeborn
Defendant: WellPet LLC and Berwind Corporation
Case Number: 4:2017cv04056
Filed: July 19, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2018 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND; GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE MATERIALS UNDER SEAL; RESOLVING DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Judge William H. Orrick granting 78 Motion for Leave to File; granting 79 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; settling 81 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiffs shall file the second amended complaint within seven days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
January 17, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 34 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
November 17, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 STIPULATION to Set Briefing Schedule as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 12/5/2017. Reply due by 12/19/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeiger et al v. WellPet LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Zeiger
Represented By: Steven M. McKany
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danz Doggie Daytrips
Represented By: Steven M. McKany
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Freeborn
Represented By: Steven M. McKany
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellPet LLC
Represented By: Joan Alexis Rabutaso Camagong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berwind Corporation
Represented By: Joan Alexis Rabutaso Camagong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?