Moralez v. California Check Cashing Stores, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Defendant: California Check Cashing Stores, LLC and Genirberg Family, LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv06141
Filed: October 26, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Francisca Moralez. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 29, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE COURT ORDERED MEDIATION REQUIRED BY GENERAL ORDER 56; filed by California Check Cashing Stores, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 12, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 THIRD STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER extending deadline to complete joint site inspection filed by California Check Cashing Stores, LLC. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 2, 2018. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER extending deadline to complete joint site inspection (second) filed by Francisca Moralez. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 14, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER extending deadline to complete joint site inspection filed by Francisca Moralez. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 30, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moralez v. California Check Cashing Stores, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Check Cashing Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genirberg Family, LLC
Represented By: Michelle R. Ferber
Represented By: James Britten Wickersham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?