Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al v. Acer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Philips Corporation and Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Defendant: Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation
Counter Defendant: Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Oy and Microsoft Mobile Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01885
Filed: April 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2018 Filing 396 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12392537.) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Gerson, Christopher) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 395 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12382616.) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Lieber, Natalie) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 394 NOTICE of Appearance for Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation by Hsiang James H Lin (Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 5/24/2018) Modified on 5/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2018 Filing 393 NOTICE of Appearance for Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation by Kaiwen Tseng (Tseng, Kaiwen) (Filed on 5/24/2018) Modified on 5/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2018 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance for Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation by Craig R. Kaufman (Kaufman, Craig) (Filed on 5/24/2018) Modified on 5/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2018 Filing 391 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12381199.) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Suarez, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 390 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12381142.) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Thomason, Kyle) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 389 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12381108.) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Krinsky, David) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 388 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12380626.) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Maurer, Aaron) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 387 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12380456.) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Hardy, Kevin) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 386 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12380303.) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Genderson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 385 NOTICE of Appearance for Acer Inc., Acer America Corp. by Christopher Scott Geyer (Geyer, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2018) Modified on 5/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Re: #384 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation, #383 Notice of Appearance filed by Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation. REMINDER TO COUNSEL In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:18-cv-01885-HSG. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 384 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Amy Marie Bailey (Bailey, Amy) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 383 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Marie Bailey (Bailey, Amy) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 382 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12342453.) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Cardenas-Navia, Jaime) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 381 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12335599.) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Pickens, Robert) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 380 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12335557.) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Sandonato, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 379 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12335438.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/08/2018 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Apgar, Daniel) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 378 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12329779.) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Bingaman, Caitlyn) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 377 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12329695.) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (McCarthy, Sean) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 376 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12329625.) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Nadipuram, Joyce) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 375 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12324802.) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Sharret, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 374 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12324730.) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Pymento, Julian) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 373 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Christopher T. Holland (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 372 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Isaac Jacobs (Jacobs, Ethan) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 371 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori L. Holland (Holland, Lori) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 370 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T. Holland (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 369 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the District of Delaware, Their Case Number is 1:15-cv-1170-GMS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 368 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting the Renewed Motions to Transfer to the Northern District of California and Joinders of such motions. See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/27/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
March 26, 2018 Filing 365 JOINDER by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., joining in #363 Motion to Stay . (Russell, Andrew)
March 23, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Renew Motion to Stay ( #363 ) has been replaced to include the Rule 7.1.1 certification. (mdb)
March 22, 2018 Filing 364 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #363 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review (Renewed) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H)(Tennyson, Eleanor) Modified on 3/23/2018 (mdb).
March 22, 2018 Filing 363 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review (Renewed) - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Tennyson, Eleanor) (Main Document 363 replaced on 3/23/2018) (mdb). Modified on 3/23/2018 (mdb).
March 22, 2018 Filing 362 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Amended and Supplemental Response and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's Interrogatory No. 4 filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Russell, Andrew)
March 22, 2018 Filing 361 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rudy Roth on March 29, 2018 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
March 21, 2018 Filing 360 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Supplemental Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Russell, Andrew)
March 19, 2018 Filing 359 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Philips' Amended Response to Microsoft's First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
March 19, 2018 Filing 358 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections and Responses to Acer Defendants' Individual Interrogatory No. 4 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
March 19, 2018 Filing 357 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation's Sixth Supplemental Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A)(1) and D. Del.'s Default Standard for Discovery Section 3(A), filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
March 19, 2018 Filing 356 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ceren Pala Okat on March 28, 2018 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
March 19, 2018 Filing 355 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kevin Scott on March 22, 2018 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
March 19, 2018 Filing 354 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul Im on March 20-21, 2018 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
March 19, 2018 Filing 353 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants and intervenor-plaintiff/counterclaim defendant-in-intervention Microsoft Corporation's Joint Third Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
March 19, 2018 Filing 352 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Philips' Interrogatory Nos. 4 & 6 to Acer Defendants filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
March 16, 2018 Filing 351 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Amended and Supplemental Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's Interrogatories Nos. 4, 6, and 7 filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Keller, Karen)
March 13, 2018 Filing 350 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INTERVENOR MICROSOFT'S SECOND AMENDED INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Russell, Andrew)
March 6, 2018 Filing 349 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PHILIPS FIFTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO MICROSOFT (NOS. 16-18) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
March 5, 2018 Filing 348 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO ACER'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF (NOS. 2-96) re #331 Notice of Service filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
March 5, 2018 Filing 347 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation's Fifth Supplemental Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A)(1) and D. Del.'s Default Standard for Discovery Section 3(A), filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Tennyson, Eleanor)
February 28, 2018 Filing 346 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation's Objections and Responses to Philips' Fifth Set of Interrogatories to the Acer Defendants (No. 18), filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2018 Filing 345 NOTICE of of Third Party Subpoena by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. (Tennyson, Eleanor)
February 27, 2018 Filing 344 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation (Nos. 1-29) filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Keller, Karen)
February 23, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Julian G. Pymento for Koninklijke Philips N.V. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(nmg)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (314 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 342 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joelle P. Justus filed by ASUSTek Computer Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation, ASUS Computer International. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/20/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (297 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 274 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 313 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 341 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 219 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 273 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julian G. Pymento filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/20/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
February 20, 2018 Filing 343 NOTICE of Third Party Subpoena directed to Proxim Wireless Corporation by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Russell, Andrew)
February 19, 2018 Filing 342 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joelle P. Justus - filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
February 16, 2018 Filing 341 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julian G. Pymento - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Julian G. Pymento)(Silver, Daniel)
February 16, 2018 Filing 340 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jack Slobod on March 2, 2018 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
February 16, 2018 Filing 339 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andrei Filip on March 1, 2018 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
February 16, 2018 Filing 338 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Franciscus Lucas Antonius Johannes Kamperman on February 28, 2018 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
February 16, 2018 Filing 337 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Warner ten Kate on February 23, 2018 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
February 16, 2018 Filing 336 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Leonardus G.M. Beuk on February 22, 2018 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
February 15, 2018 Filing 335 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PHILIPS' RESPONSES TO MICROSOFT'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 5-7) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
February 5, 2018 Filing 334 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Philips' Amended Infringement Contentions for Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
February 5, 2018 Filing 333 REDACTED VERSION of (299 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 263 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 329 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 207 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 289 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 266 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Notice of Service by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 5, 2018 Filing 332 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to ARM Holdings USA, Inc. on 1/30/2018 (Silver, Daniel)
February 1, 2018 Filing 331 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer's Second Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Nos. 2-96), filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
January 31, 2018 Filing 330 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Second Amended and Supplemental Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Russell, Andrew)
January 29, 2018 Filing 329 [SEALED] NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena and Notice of Deposition to Non-Party ARM Holdings US, Inc. filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
January 29, 2018 Filing 328 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
January 29, 2018 Filing 327 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's Third Set of Requests for Production filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Russell, Andrew)
January 29, 2018 Filing 326 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Philips' Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Acer Defendants (Nos. 135-137), filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
January 29, 2018 Filing 325 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Texas Instruments, Inc. on 1/25/2018 (Silver, Daniel)
January 25, 2018 Filing 324 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Qualcomm, Inc. on 1/23/2018 (Silver, Daniel)
January 25, 2018 Filing 323 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to NVIDIA Corp. on 1/23/2018 (Silver, Daniel)
January 25, 2018 Filing 322 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to MediaTek USA, Inc. on 1/23/2018 (Silver, Daniel)
January 25, 2018 Filing 321 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Intel Corporation on 1/23/2018 (Silver, Daniel)
January 25, 2018 Filing 320 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. on 1/23/2018 (Silver, Daniel)
January 25, 2018 Filing 319 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena and Notice of Deposition to Non-PartyTexas Instruments Inc. filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
January 24, 2018 Filing 318 NOTICE of Subpoena to, and Deposition of, Rakesh Taori by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. (Smith, Rodger)
January 22, 2018 Filing 317 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation's Fourth Supplemental Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and D. Del.'s Default Standard for Discovery Section 3(A), filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Tennyson, Eleanor)
January 16, 2018 Filing 316 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Interrogatories to the Acer Defendants, filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
January 9, 2018 Filing 315 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Interrogatories filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Keller, Karen)
January 9, 2018 Filing 314 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' SECOND SET OF COMMON INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 3-7) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
January 8, 2018 Filing 313 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Amended and Supplemental Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's Interrogatory No. 4 filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Keller, Karen)
January 5, 2018 Remark - Two signed and sealed copies of the letter request ( #307 -1) have been left in the Clerk's Office for local counsel to pick up. (mdb)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 312 SO ORDERED - re #307 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance from Quebec, Canada (Unopposed) filed by Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/5/2018. (mdb)
January 4, 2018 Filing 311 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Russell, Andrew)
January 3, 2018 Filing 310 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Neil Hinnant on January 19, 2018 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
January 2, 2018 Filing 309 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation Nos. (5-7) filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Keller, Karen)
December 29, 2017 Filing 308 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
December 22, 2017 Filing 307 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance from Quebec, Canada (Unopposed) - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Letter of Request), #2 Exhibits 1-4 to Proposed Letter of Request)(Tennyson, Eleanor)
December 21, 2017 Filing 306 NOTICE to Take Deposition of See Notice for Details filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
December 20, 2017 Filing 305 NOTICE of Subpoena by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. (Tennyson, Eleanor)
December 19, 2017 Filing 304 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Koninkliijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 SO ORDERED - re (267 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 189 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 300 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 240 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 237 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of Certain Deadlines in the Case Scheduling Order. Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: (Fact Discovery completed by 4/27/2018., Opening Expert Reports due by 5/18/2018., Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 6/29/2018., Expert Discovery due by 8/10/2018., Opening SJ Letter Briefs due by 8/17/2018., Answering Letter Briefs due by 8/31/2018., Reply Letter Briefs due 9/7/2018. See Stipulation for more scheduling order amendments). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/11/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
December 6, 2017 Filing 302 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #295 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California (Renewed Motion) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2017. (Silver, Daniel)
December 6, 2017 Filing 301 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #295 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California (Renewed Motion) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2017. (Silver, Daniel)
December 6, 2017 Filing 300 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of Certain Deadlines in the Case Scheduling Order to - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
December 5, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tiffany P. Cunningham for Microsoft Corporation,added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(lmm)
December 5, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sarah E. Stahnke for Microsoft Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(lmm)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (253 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 239 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 265 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 299 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 236 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tiffany P. Cunningham and Sarah E. Stahnke filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/4/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
December 1, 2017 Filing 299 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tiffany P. Cunningham and Sarah E. Stahnke - filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.. (Russell, Andrew)
December 1, 2017 Filing 298 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' [Corrected] Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
November 30, 2017 Filing 297 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
November 30, 2017 Filing 296 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fourth and Fifth Sets of Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
November 29, 2017 Filing 295 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California (Renewed Motion) - filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Pursuant to Local Rue 7.1.1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Andrew)
November 29, 2017 Filing 294 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #293 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2017. (Smith, Rodger)
November 29, 2017 Filing 293 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
November 29, 2017 Filing 292 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Acers and ASUSs First Request for Production (No. 1) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER re (182 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 255 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 246 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 229 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 289 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Stipulation - The Plaintiffs' proposal is ADOPTED. The parties' supplemental briefing will consist of an opening brief and an answering brief. If the court would like a reply or sur-reply, the court will request such papers from the parties.. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/28/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
November 27, 2017 Filing 290 Official Transcript of T/C held on 11 17 17 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2018. (kjm)
November 22, 2017 Filing 289 STIPULATION Regarding Supplemental Briefing Related to Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
November 22, 2017 Filing 288 NOTICE of Amended Third Party Subpoena by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc. (Attachments: #1 Amended Subpoena directed to P&F USA, Inc.)(Russell, Andrew)
November 17, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Telephone Conference held on 11/17/2017. The parties shall confer offline and come to an agreement on what issues need to be addressed after the Federal Circuit's recent rulings on petitions for writ of mandamus regarding motions to transfer. The parties shall file a joint stipulation that outlines the issue(s), the proposed schedule, and page length of supplemental briefing, by Wednesday, November 22, 2017. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re USCA Order - A Telephone Conference is set for Friday, November 17, 2017 at 2:00 PM (EST) to discuss the implications of the Federal Circuit's Order denying the petitions for a writ of mandamus. Plaintiffs are to arrange the call and contact Chambers at 302-573-4559 once all parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/15/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER of USCA. Decision of USCA: The petitions for a writ of mandamus are denied. (mdb)
November 10, 2017 Filing 286 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Sanjiv P. Laud as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with the firm. (Smith, Rodger)
November 6, 2017 Filing 285 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Objections and Responses to Philips' Interrogatory Nos. 4 and 6-8 to Acer Defendants; and (2) Defendants and Intervenor-Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant-in-Intervention Microsoft Corporation's Production Under 4(d) of the Court's Default Standard for Discovery, Including Defendants' Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions, filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
November 3, 2017 Filing 284 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Amended and Supplemental Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's Interrogatories Nos. 4, 6, and 7 filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Russell, Andrew)
October 30, 2017 Filing 283 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer's and ASUS's First Request for Production to Plaintiff (No. 1) filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (281 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 247 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kyle E. Thomason filed by ASUSTek Computer Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation, ASUS Computer International. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/27/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
October 27, 2017 Filing 282 Amended NOTICE of Deposition of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc. by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
October 27, 2017 Filing 281 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kyle E. Thomason - filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
October 25, 2017 Filing 280 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Russell, Andrew)
October 24, 2017 Filing 279 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED IDENTIFICATION OF THE ACER DEFENDANTS ACCUSED PRODUCTS filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
October 23, 2017 Filing 278 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED IDENTIFICATION OF THE MICROSOFT COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS ACCUSED PRODUCTS filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
October 20, 2017 Filing 277 NOTICE to Take Deposition of See Notice for Details filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
October 17, 2017 Filing 276 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Acer Defendants' First Interrogatories to Plaintiffs; and (2) Acer Inc. and Acer America Corp.'s Response to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6), filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
October 17, 2017 Filing 275 NOTICE of Subpoena to Non-Party Google Inc. by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
October 13, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nicole Yvonne Stoddard for Koninklijke Philips N.V. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01170-GMS et al.(ceg)
October 12, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Caitlyn N. Bingaman for Koninklijke Philips N.V.,U.S. Philips Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01170-GMS et al.(crb)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (274 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 176 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 223 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 236 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 239 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 220 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Caitlyn N. Bingaman and Nicole Yvonne Stoddard filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/11/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
October 10, 2017 Filing 274 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Caitlyn N. Bingaman and Nicole Yvonne Stoddard - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Caitlyn N. Bingaman and Nicole Yvonne Stoddard)(Smyth, Benjamin)
October 4, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick J. McKeever for Microsoft Corporation,Patrick J. McKeever for Microsoft Mobile Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(crb)
October 4, 2017 Filing 273 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Infringement Contentions Against the Microsoft Counterclaim Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
October 4, 2017 Filing 272 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Infringement Contentions Against the Acer Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (236 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 271 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 234 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 217 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 220 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick J. McKeever filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/2/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
October 2, 2017 Filing 271 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick J. McKeever - filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.. (Russell, Andrew)
September 29, 2017 Filing 270 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Philips' Interrogatories to Acer Defendants (No. 9); and (2) Acer's Fourth Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Acer (Nos. 1 and 2) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
September 28, 2017 Filing 269 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Notice of Deposition of Hitachi America, Ltd. filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Russell, Andrew)
September 22, 2017 Filing 268 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Intervenor Microsoft's First Amended Initial Disclosures filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Keller, Karen)
September 11, 2017 Filing 267 NOTICE of Deposition of Sung M. Choi by Visual Land, Inc., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Southern Telecom Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp. (Tennyson, Eleanor)
September 8, 2017 Filing 266 REDACTED VERSION of (201 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 249 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 206 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 165 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 216 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 220 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 165 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Notice of Service of Subpoena and Notice of Deposition to Non-Party Google, Inc. by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
September 7, 2017 Filing 265 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Russell, Andrew)
September 7, 2017 Filing 264 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jared W. Crop as co-counsel.. (Keller, Karen)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 SO ORDERED - re (262 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 212 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 209 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 228 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 225 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Stipulation (and proposed order) Concerning Previous Engagement By Dr. Nathaniel Polish filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/1/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
August 29, 2017 Filing 262 STIPULATION (and proposed order) Concerning Previous Engagement By Dr. Nathaniel Polish by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
August 23, 2017 Filing 261 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.s Second Amended and Supplemental Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporations First Set of Interrogatories (Interrogatories Nos. 1-3) filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Russell, Andrew)
August 15, 2017 Filing 260 NOTICE of Third Party Subpoenas by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Russell, Andrew)
August 11, 2017 Filing 259 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Belk on August 18, 2017 filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Visual Land, Inc., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
August 4, 2017 Filing 258 NOTICE of Docketing USCA for the Federal Circuit re Petition for Writ of Mandamus - USCA 17-132 In re: Acer, Inc. (asw)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (257 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Deadline for the Parties to Exchange Privilege Logs to August 25, 2017 (from August 4, 2017) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/4/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(asw)
August 4, 2017 Filing 257 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Deadline for the Parties to Exchange Privilege Logs to August 25, 2017 (from August 4, 2017) - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 1, 2017 Filing 256 REDACTED VERSION of #252 Notice of Service by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 1, 2017 Filing 255 REDACTED VERSION of #251 Notice of Service by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 1, 2017 Filing 254 REDACTED VERSION of #250 Notice of Service by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 25, 2017 Filing 253 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Sung M. Choi on 07/11/2017, filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Russell, Andrew)
July 25, 2017 Filing 252 [SEALED] NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena and Notice of Deposition to Non-Party filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
July 25, 2017 Filing 251 [SEALED] NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena and Notice of Deposition to Non-Party filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
July 25, 2017 Filing 250 [SEALED] NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena and Notice of Deposition to Non-Party filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
July 25, 2017 Filing 249 [SEALED] NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena and Notice of Deposition to Non-Party filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2017 Filing 248 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' and Intervenor-Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant-in-Intervention Microsoft Corporation's First Supplemental Joint Invalidity Contentions and Supplemental Prior Art filed by Microsoft Corporation, Visual Land, Inc., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
July 24, 2017 Filing 247 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation's Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's Third Set of Interrogatories, filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
July 24, 2017 Filing 246 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories; and 2) Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Keller, Karen)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER re (197 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 244 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 161 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 201 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 212 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 162 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 215 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Memorandum - Defendants' Joint Motion for Transfer (C.A. No. 15-1125-GMS, D.I. 166; C.A. 15-1126-GMS, 129; C.A. 15-1128-GMS, D.I. 129; C.A. No. 15-1131, D.I. 150; C.A. No. 15-1170-GMS, D.I. 194) is DENIED; and Microsoft's Motion to Transfer (C.A. No. 15-1125-GMS, D.I. 173; C.A. No. 15-1127-GMS, D.I. 163; C.A. No. 15-1130-GMS, D.I. 170; C.A. No. 15-1131-GMS, D.I. 157; C.A. No. 15-1170-GMS, D.I. 201) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/19/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
July 19, 2017 Filing 244 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/19/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (243 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 214 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce R. Genderson of WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP filed by Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/18/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
July 17, 2017 Filing 243 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce R. Genderson of WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
July 17, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of the Notice to Take Deposition of Dennis Boyle (IDEO) has been corrected to reflect the date of July 28, 2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
July 17, 2017 Filing 242 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dennis Boyle (IDEO) on July 28, 2017 at 9:30 am filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Keller, Karen) Modified on 7/17/2017 (mdb). Modified on 7/17/2017 (mdb).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (209 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin Hardy, Aaron P. Maurer, David M. Krinsky, Christopher A. Suarez, Sanjiv P. Laud, and Christopher S. Geyer filed by ASUSTek Computer Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., ASUS Computer International, (238 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin Hardy, Aaron P. Maurer, David M. Krinsky, Christopher A. Suarez, Sanjiv P. Laud, and Christopher S. Geyer filed by Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/14/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - re (229 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 202 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 185 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 153 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 193 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 154 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 193 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Proposed Amended Scheduling Order. The parties' proposed schedule is adopted-in-part, with changes made to the pretrial and trial associated deadlines: Fact Discovery completed by 2/16/2018., Opening Expert Reports due by 3/16/2018., Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 4/27/2018., Expert Discovery due by 6/22/2018., Opening Summary Judgment Letter Briefs due by 6/29/2018., Answering Letter Briefs due 7/13/2018., Reply Letter Briefs due 7/20/2018., A Trial Planning Conference is set for 9/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A., Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2018., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A., A 10-day Jury Trial is set for 1/7/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4A. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/14/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (211 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 240 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick A. Fitch filed by ASUSTek Computer Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation, ASUS Computer International. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/13/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER Construing the Terms of U.S. Patent Nos. RE44,913, 6,690,387, 7,184,064, 7,529,806, 5,910,797, 6,522,695, 8,543,819, 9,436,809, 6,772,114, RE43,564. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/11/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01170-GMS et al.(mdb)
July 11, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Markman Order has been removed due to some clerical errors and will be refiled shortly. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01170-GMS et al.(mdb)
July 11, 2017 Filing 240 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick A. Fitch - filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
July 10, 2017 Filing 239 Third NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Relating to Venue Motions by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Silver, Daniel)
July 10, 2017 Filing 238 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin Hardy, Aaron P. Maurer, David M. Krinsky, Christopher A. Suarez, Sanjiv P. Laud, and Christopher S. Geyer - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
July 5, 2017 Filing 237 Second NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Relating to Venue Motions by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C to Philips' Second Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Smyth, Benjamin)
June 30, 2017 Filing 236 NOTICE of Subpoena (Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation's Notice of Third Party Subpoena) by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. (Tennyson, Eleanor)
June 30, 2017 Filing 235 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS AND INTERVENOR-PLAINTIFFS THIRD SET OF COMMON INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF/INTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. AND U.S. PHILIPS CORPORATION (NOS. 8-9) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
June 30, 2017 Filing 234 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Acer's Third Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Acer (Nos. 1 and 5) and (2) First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Philips' Interrogatories to Acer Defendants (Set Two) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Tennyson, Eleanor)
June 30, 2017 Filing 233 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc. re (173 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (201 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (157 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (170 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (163 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. (Keller, Karen)
June 30, 2017 Filing 232 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Karen Elizabeth Keller. Attorney John W. Shaw and Andrew E. Russell. Ashby & Geddes attorneys Steven J. Balick and Andrew C. Mayo terminated. (Keller, Karen)
June 30, 2017 Filing 231 REQUEST for Oral Argument by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp. re (166 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (201 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (129 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of New York, (129 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington, (150 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. (Smith, Rodger)
June 28, 2017 Filing 230 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Regarding Joint Motion to Transfer by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp. (Attachments: #1 W.D. Wash. C.A.17-5067 Opinion)(Smith, Rodger)
June 27, 2017 Filing 229 PROPOSED ORDER Amending Rule 16 Scheduling Order re (48 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 44 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 45 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 52 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 49 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 46 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 47 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Proposed Order by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet)(Smith, Rodger)
June 27, 2017 Filing 228 REPLY BRIEF re #201 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 27, 2017 Filing 227 DECLARATION re (226 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Reply Brief, (151 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Reply Brief, (199 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Reply Brief, (182 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Reply Brief, (152 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) Reply Brief -- Declaration of Sherrie Gietzen -- by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Smith, Rodger)
June 27, 2017 Filing 226 REPLY BRIEF re #194 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Smith, Rodger)
June 26, 2017 Filing 225 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Relating to Venue Motions by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Daniel)
June 26, 2017 Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
June 23, 2017 Filing 223 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc. filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
June 23, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sean M. McCarthy for Koninklijke Philips N.V.,Sean M. McCarthy for U.S. Philips Corporation, added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01127-GMS et al.(crb)
June 23, 2017 Filing 222 Official Transcript of Discovery Conference held on 6/20//17 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2017. (kjm)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (183 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 185 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 173 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 146 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 145 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 190 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 217 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean M. McCarthy filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/22/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
June 20, 2017 Filing 221 DECLARATION re (184 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (220 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (186 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (176 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (193 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Claims Under 28 U.S.C. Section1404(a) by Daniel A. Apgar by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Silver, Daniel)
June 20, 2017 Filing 220 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #201 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/27/2017. (Silver, Daniel)
June 20, 2017 Filing 219 DECLARATION re (174 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (146 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (218 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer of Daniel A. Apgar by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Silver, Daniel)
June 20, 2017 Filing 218 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #194 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/27/2017. (Silver, Daniel)
June 20, 2017 Filing 217 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean M. McCarthy - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Sean M. McCarthy Certification)(Smyth, Benjamin)
June 20, 2017 Filing 216 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
June 20, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Discovery Conference held on 6/20/2017. The parties shall file an amended proposed scheduling order by 6/27/2017. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
June 16, 2017 Filing 215 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Discovery Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Silver, Daniel)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - A Discovery Dispute Hearing (continuation of #3 held 6/8/17) is set for Tuesday, June 20, 2017, at 2:00 PM (EST) in Courtroom 4A before the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/13/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al. (ctd)
June 13, 2017 Filing 214 Official Transcript of Discovery Hearing held on 06 08 17 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2017. (kjm)
June 13, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Service ( #212 ) has been replaced and the docket text has been corrected at the request of the filer. (mdb)
June 12, 2017 Filing 213 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's Second Set of Requests for Production filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Balick, Steven)
June 12, 2017 Filing 212 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Philips Requests for Production to Acer Defendants (Set Two) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Main Document 212 replaced on 6/13/2017) (mdb). Modified on 6/13/2017 (mdb).
June 12, 2017 Filing 211 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jacquelyn A. Martino on June 13, 2017 filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Visual Land, Inc., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
June 9, 2017 Filing 210 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.v. and U.S. Philips Corporation (Nos. 1-4) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
June 9, 2017 Filing 209 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 7-12) filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
June 9, 2017 Filing 208 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Acer Defendants' Third Supplemental Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and D. Del.'s Default Standard For Discovery Section 3(A); (2) Acer's Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Acer (Nos. 1, 2, 3 and 5); and (3) Objections and Responses to Philips' Interrogatories to Acer Defendants (Set Two) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
June 8, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Discovery Conference (#3) held on 6/8/2017. The parties will discuss managing the overarching discovery issues in this case and file a joint status report on Friday, June 16, 2017. The Court will set a date for a follow-up in-court discovery conference sometime during the week of June 19, 2017, after the parties jointly contact Chambers and request a date/time. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
June 8, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Natalie Lieber for Koninklijke Philips N.V.,Natalie Lieber for U.S. Philips Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(crb)
June 6, 2017 Filing 207 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Matthew J. Bickerton on June 7, 2017 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
June 6, 2017 Filing 206 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response to Defendants' Common Interrogatory No. 2 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
June 6, 2017 Filing 205 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Joint Letter Agenda. (Silver, Daniel)
June 6, 2017 Filing 204 DECLARATION re #202 Opening Brief in Support (Declaration of Sha Viswanathan) by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 6, 2017 Filing 203 DECLARATION re #202 Opening Brief in Support (Declaration of Christina McCullough) by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 6, 2017 Filing 202 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #201 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2017. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 6, 2017 Filing 201 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 6, 2017 Filing 200 DECLARATION re (129 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of New York, (129 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington, (194 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (150 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (166 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California -- Declaration of Godwin Yan -- by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Smith, Rodger)
June 6, 2017 Filing 199 DECLARATION re (129 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of New York, (129 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington, (194 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (150 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (166 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California -- Declaration of Bin Wang -- by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Smith, Rodger)
June 6, 2017 Filing 198 DECLARATION re (129 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of New York, (129 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington, (194 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (150 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (166 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California -- Declaration of Michael Wagner -- by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Smith, Rodger)
June 6, 2017 Filing 197 DECLARATION re (129 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of New York, (129 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington, (194 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (150 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (166 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California -- Declaration of Alan Levi -- by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Smith, Rodger)
June 6, 2017 Filing 196 DECLARATION re (129 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of New York, (129 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington, (194 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (150 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, (166 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California -- Declaration of Sherrie Gietzen -- by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Smith, Rodger)
June 6, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document in D.I. #196 DECLARATION has been deleted from the docket. The next filing in this case shall be assigned D.I. 196. (asw)
June 6, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Declarations recently filed have been removed at the request of the filer. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS(mdb)
June 6, 2017 Filing 195 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #194 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2017. (Smith, Rodger)
June 6, 2017 Filing 194 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
June 2, 2017 Filing 193 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Acer (Interrogatory No. 4) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
June 2, 2017 Filing 192 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 3-7) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
June 2, 2017 Filing 191 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s First Amended and Supplemental Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
June 1, 2017 Filing 190 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Sung M. Choi by YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp. (Keller, Karen)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (161 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 125 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 189 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 163 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 145 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 157 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 125 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natalie Lieber filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/1/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
June 1, 2017 Filing 189 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natalie Lieber - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Natalie Lieber)(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - A Discovery Dispute Hearing (#3) is set for Thursday, June 8, 2017 at 10:00 AM (EST) in Courtroom 4A. The parties shall file a Joint Letter Agenda by NOON on Tuesday, June 6, 2017. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/24/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
May 24, 2017 Filing 188 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Zimmerman on May 25, 2017 filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
May 22, 2017 Filing 187 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Zach Ke on June 29, 2017 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 22, 2017 Filing 186 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Victor Chang on June 30, 2017 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 22, 2017 Filing 185 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stanley Chen on June 28, 2017 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 22, 2017 Filing 184 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sanjeev Kumar on June 21, 2017 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 22, 2017 Filing 183 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michelle Leavitt on June 22, 2017 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 22, 2017 Filing 182 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken Lu on June 29, 2017 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 22, 2017 Filing 181 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Huang on June 28, 2017 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 22, 2017 Filing 180 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jonas Chen on June 27, 2017 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 22, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jimmy Hung on June 23, 2017 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 22, 2017 Filing 178 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jessy Jung on June 27, 2017 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 22, 2017 Filing 177 NOTICE to Take Deposition of HM Yeh on June 26, 2017 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 22, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joyce L. Nadipuram for Koninklijke Philips N.V.,Joyce L. Nadipuram for U.S. Philips Corporation, added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(crb)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (148 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 159 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 123 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 143 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 151 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 176 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 122 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Giancarlo Scaccia and Joyce Nadipuram filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/22/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
May 18, 2017 Filing 176 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Giancarlo Scaccia and Joyce Nadipuram - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Giancarlo Scaccia and Joyce Nadipuram)(Smyth, Benjamin)
May 12, 2017 Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
May 11, 2017 Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft's Notice of Third Party Subpoenas filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
May 11, 2017 Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
May 11, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories to the Defendants has been removed at the request of the filer and will be re-filed shortly. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01170-GMS et al.(mdb)
May 10, 2017 Filing 172 NOTICE of Third Party Subpoena (Shteyn) by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. (Smith, Rodger)
May 10, 2017 Filing 171 NOTICE of Third Party Subpoena (HP) by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. (Smith, Rodger)
May 10, 2017 Filing 170 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation (Nos. 1-4) filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
May 9, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Transcript of the Markman Hearing has been replaced to correct the date of the proceeding. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01170-GMS et al.(mdb)
May 9, 2017 Filing 169 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 05 03 17 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (kjm) (Main Document 169 replaced on 5/9/2017) (mdb).
May 3, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Markman Hearing held on 5/3/2017. Claim construction presentations. The court will take this matter under advisement and issue a ruling in due course - (Note: The Order will take longer than 30 days to issue). The parties are ordered to report back to the court either by Stipulation or Letter regarding case consolidation as discussed. (Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer.) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(asw)
May 1, 2017 Filing 168 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories and Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
April 21, 2017 Filing 167 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yevgeniy Eugene Shteyn on April 27, 2017 filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Visual Land, Inc., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
April 20, 2017 Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants and Intervenor-Plaintiffs Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff/Intervenor-Defendants Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation (Nos. 8-9) and Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants and Intervenor-Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation (Nos. 42-52) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
April 7, 2017 Filing 165 Joint APPENDIX of Intrinsic Evidence by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Tabs 1-29, #2 Tabs 30-40)(Silver, Daniel)
March 31, 2017 Filing 164 EXHIBIT re (127 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (107 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (109 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (132 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (160 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (134 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (139 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, [CORRECTED EXHIBIT NO. 11 TO DEFENDANTS' ANSWERING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF] by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Keller, Karen)
March 31, 2017 Filing 163 DECLARATION re #160 Claim Construction Answering Brief [of Z. Xiong] by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger)
March 31, 2017 Filing 162 DECLARATION re #160 Claim Construction Answering Brief [of L. Terveen] by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
March 31, 2017 Filing 161 DECLARATION re #160 Claim Construction Answering Brief [of B. Schneier] by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger)
March 31, 2017 Filing 160 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re #140 Claim Construction Opening Brief, #141 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5-12)(Smith, Rodger)
March 31, 2017 Filing 159 Supplemental DECLARATION re (132 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (141 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (113 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (131 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (131 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (105 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (158 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Claim Construction Answering Brief of Jonathan M. Sharret by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18-27, #2 Exhibit 28-35)(Silver, Daniel)
March 31, 2017 Filing 158 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF (Plaintiffs') filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Silver, Daniel)
March 31, 2017 Filing 157 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on 3/30/17 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2017. (kjm)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER in case 1:15-cv-01125-GMS; denying without prejudice (114) Motion to Stay in case 1:15-cv-01170-GMS. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/30/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(asw)
March 30, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Telephone Conference Re Discovery held on 3/30/2017. Discussion on the disputed items as listed in the Joint Agenda submission. The court ordered the parties to have a further meet and confer to resolve the remaining items as discussed. (Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer.) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(asw)
March 28, 2017 Filing 155 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Rodger D. Smith II regarding the parties joint letter agenda, pursuant to paragraph 5(a) of the Scheduling Order, to apprise the Court of the disputed issues. (Smith, Rodger)
March 23, 2017 Filing 154 ANSWER to #86 Answer to Intervenor Complaint, Counterclaim by Microsoft Mobile Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
March 21, 2017 Filing 153 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants' and Intervenor-Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation (Nos. 42-52) 2) Defendants' and Intervenor-Plaintiff's Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff/Intervenor-Defendant Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation (Nos. 8-9) filed by YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: A Discovery Telephone Conference (#2) is set for Thursday, 3/30/2017, at 2:00 PM (EST). A Discovery Conference (#1) was held on 10/20/2016. The court directs plaintiff's counsel to arrange the teleconference and contact chambers at (302) 573-4559 once all the participants are on the line. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/16/2017. (ctd)
March 9, 2017 Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to the Microsoft Counterclaim Defendants and Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to the Microsoft Counterclaim Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
March 8, 2017 Filing 151 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Microsoft Mobile Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
March 7, 2017 Filing 150 REDACTED VERSION of #147 Declaration of Spencer Ramsey (CORRECTED) by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
March 7, 2017 Filing 149 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Daniel M. Silver regarding Corrected Copies of Declarations of Spencer Ramsey and Andrei Filip - re #147 Declaration, #148 Declaration. (Silver, Daniel)
March 7, 2017 Filing 148 DECLARATION re #130 Declaration of Andrei Filip (CORRECTED) by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
March 7, 2017 Filing 147 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #129 Declaration, of Spencer Ramsey (CORRECTED) by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
March 3, 2017 Filing 146 DECLARATION re (140 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (98 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (126 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (119 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (114 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (95 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (117 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief of Jonathan M. Sharret by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15-17)(Silver, Daniel)
March 3, 2017 Filing 145 DECLARATION re (140 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (114 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (98 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (126 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (119 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (95 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (117 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief of Douglas Schmidt, Ph.D. by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
March 3, 2017 Filing 144 DECLARATION re (140 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (114 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (98 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (126 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (119 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (95 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (117 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief of Natahaniel Polish by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Microsoft Corporation, U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Daniel)
March 3, 2017 Filing 143 DECLARATION re (140 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (114 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (98 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (126 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (119 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (95 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (117 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief of Philip Grenspun, Ph.D. by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Daniel)
March 3, 2017 Filing 142 DECLARATION re (140 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (114 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (98 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (126 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (119 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (95 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (117 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Claim Construction Opening Brief of Michael T. Goodrich by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Daniel)
March 3, 2017 Filing 141 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Smith, Rodger)
March 3, 2017 Filing 140 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Daniel)
March 3, 2017 Filing 139 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation re #114 MOTION to Stay the Case Pending Inter Partes Review. (Silver, Daniel)
March 3, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jan Van Ee on March 6, 2017 filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Visual Land, Inc., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2017 Filing 137 REDACTED VERSION of #133 Reply Brief by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
March 1, 2017 Filing 136 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Alston & Bird) by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. (Smith, Rodger)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (92 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 132 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 115 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 115 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 111 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 122 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 95 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) Proposed Order filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/27/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
February 24, 2017 Filing 135 REDACTED VERSION of #129 Declaration, of Spencer Ramsey by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Silver, Daniel)
February 24, 2017 Filing 134 REDACTED VERSION of #128 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Motion to Stay the Case Pending Inter Partes Review by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Exhibit H-K, #3 Exhibit L-Z)(Silver, Daniel)
February 24, 2017 Filing 133 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #114 MOTION to Stay the Case Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
February 23, 2017 Filing 132 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
February 17, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE of Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation's Opposition to Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation re #118 Notice (Other) (Silver, Daniel)
February 17, 2017 Filing 130 DECLARATION re #128 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Andrei Filip by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 17, 2017 Filing 129 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #128 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Spencer Ramsey by U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 17, 2017 Filing 128 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #114 MOTION to Stay the Case Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Exhibit H-K, #3 Exhibit L-Z, #4 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 16, 2017 Filing 127 REPLY BRIEF re #105 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment on the Pleadings) filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (88 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 124 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 110 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 91 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 110 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 117 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 106 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION AND ORDER TO INCREASE PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING] filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/16/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01126-GMS et al.(mdb)
February 14, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE of Subsequent Developments in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Smith, Rodger)
February 10, 2017 Filing 125 CLAIM Construction Chart by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Silver, Daniel)
February 10, 2017 Filing 124 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION AND ORDER TO INCREASE PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING] - filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Russell, Andrew)
February 9, 2017 Filing 123 DECLARATION re (122 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (115 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (108 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (108 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (104 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, of Douglas Schmidt, Ph.D. by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Silver, Daniel)
February 9, 2017 Filing 122 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #105 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment on the Pleadings) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Silver, Daniel)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Stay re #120 Stipulation filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation, Set Briefing Schedule: re #114 Motion to Stay the Case Pending Inter Partes Review. (Answering Brief due 2/17/2017). Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/8/2017. (mdb)
February 8, 2017 Filing 121 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. re #94 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Smith, Rodger)
February 7, 2017 Filing 120 Joint STIPULATION and Propsoed Order to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Stay by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 6, 2017 Filing 119 REPLY BRIEF re #94 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11)(Smith, Rodger)
February 2, 2017 Filing 118 NOTICE of Intervenor-Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation's Joinder in Acer's Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review (D.I. No. 114) by Microsoft Corporation (Mayo, Andrew)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #113 Stipulation filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc. added. Microsoft Mobile Oy terminated. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/31/2017. (mdb)
January 30, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
January 30, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Proposed Claim Constructions filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
January 27, 2017 Filing 115 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #114 MOTION to Stay the Case Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/10/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-S)(Smith, Rodger)
January 27, 2017 Filing 114 MOTION to Stay the Case Pending Inter Partes Review - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
January 26, 2017 Filing 113 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Substitute Microsoft Mobile Inc. for Microsoft Mobile Oy as Counterclaim Defendant in Intervention by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Smyth, Benjamin)
January 24, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Proposed Claim Constructions filed by YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Keller, Karen)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (111 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 106 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 97 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 101 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 101 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Microsoft Corporation's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
January 20, 2017 Filing 111 Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to Microsoft Corporation's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re (103 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment on the Pleadings), (98 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment on the Pleadings), (98 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment on the Pleadings), (105 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment on the Pleadings), (94 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment on the Pleadings) by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
January 18, 2017 Filing 110 NOTICE of Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation re #97 Notice (Other) (Silver, Daniel)
January 18, 2017 Filing 109 DECLARATION re #108 Answering Brief in Opposition of Philip Greenspun, PH.D. by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Daniel)
January 18, 2017 Filing 108 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #94 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2017. (Silver, Daniel)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #107 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Responses to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to See Stip for Details filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation, Set Briefing Schedule: re #94 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Answering Brief due 1/18/2017., Reply Brief due 2/6/2017). Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/17/2017. (mdb)
January 13, 2017 Filing 107 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Responses to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to See Stip for Details - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Smyth, Benjamin)
January 13, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Stipulation (formerly DI 107) has been removed from the docket at the request of the filer. (mdb)
January 12, 2017 Filing 106 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #105 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment on the Pleadings) filed by Microsoft Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/26/2017. (Balick, Steven)
January 12, 2017 Filing 105 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment on the Pleadings) - filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Balick, Steven)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (92 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 104 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 100 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 96 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 97 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle Berger filed by Microsoft Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/11/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
January 10, 2017 Filing 104 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle Berger - filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
January 10, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Amended Identification of the Microsoft Counterclaim Defendants' Accused Products filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
January 10, 2017 Filing 102 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Identification of the Defendants' Accused Products filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
January 9, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Proposed Terms for Claim Construction filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
January 6, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Philips' Preliminary List of Proposed Claim Terms for Construction filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
January 3, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher M. Gerson for Koninklijke Philips N.V. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
January 3, 2017 Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' production under 4(d) of the Court's Default Standard for Discovery, including initial invalidity contentions and documents bearing Bates numbers PRIORART030676 through PRIORART034456 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #98 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME and Proposed Order for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Defendants to File Their Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to January 13, 2017 and January filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Set Briefing Schedule: re #94 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Answering Brief due 1/13/2017., Reply Brief due 1/27/2017.). Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/30/2016. (mdb)
December 29, 2016 Filing 98 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME and Proposed Order for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Defendants to File Their Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to January 13, 2017 and January 27, 2017 - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V.. (Silver, Daniel)
December 28, 2016 Filing 97 NOTICE of Intervenor-Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation's Joinder in Acer's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (D.I. No. 94 in C.A. No. 15-1170-GMS) by Microsoft Corporation (Mayo, Andrew)
December 27, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft's Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Microsoft Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
December 23, 2016 Filing 95 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #94 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/6/2017. (Smith, Rodger)
December 23, 2016 Filing 94 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
December 22, 2016 Filing 93 ANSWER to #86 Answer to Intervenor Complaint, Counterclaim by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Mayo, Andrew)
December 22, 2016 Filing 92 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #82 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10)(Smith, Rodger)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (83 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 87 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 89 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 78 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 77 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 91 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 86 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher M. Gerson filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/22/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
December 20, 2016 Filing 91 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher M. Gerson - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Christopher M. Gerson)(Smyth, Benjamin)
December 15, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 3-7) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
December 14, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jaime F Cardenas-Navia for Koninklijke Philips N.V. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (84 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 85 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 87 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 89 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 81 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 75 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 76 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jaime F. Cardenas-Navia filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/13/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
December 13, 2016 Filing 89 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jaime F. Cardenas-Navia - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Jaime F. Cardenas-Navia)(Smyth, Benjamin)
December 12, 2016 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Amended Infringement Contentions Against Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
December 12, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infrigement Contentions Against the Microsoft Counterclaim Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
December 9, 2016 Filing 86 ANSWER to #74 Intervenor Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Oy by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9)(Silver, Daniel)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (79 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 81 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 77 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 83 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 85 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Microsoft's Complaint to December 9, 2016 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/7/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS(mdb)
December 5, 2016 Filing 85 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Microsoft's Complaint to December 9, 2016 - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
November 30, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jared W. Crop for Microsoft Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
November 29, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation's Core Technical Document Production Pursuant to the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Microsoft Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
November 28, 2016 Filing 83 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,436,809; . (Silver, Daniel)
November 23, 2016 Filing 82 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.- filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11, #2 Patent/Trademark Report Amended)(Silver, Daniel)
November 21, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Acer filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
November 21, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christina J. McCullough for Microsoft Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(dmp, )
November 17, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Tennyson, Eleanor)
November 17, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-41) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SO ORDERED - re (70 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 74 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 67 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 76 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 67 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 75 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 69 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re the filing of Second Amended Complaints. See Stipulation for more details. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (75 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 73 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 69 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 68 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 74 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chad Campbell, Judith B. Jennison, Christina McCullough, and Jared W. Crop filed by Microsoft Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(mdb)
November 11, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation (Nos. 3-7) filed by Visual Land, Inc., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Tennyson, Eleanor)
November 10, 2016 Filing 76 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Smyth, Benjamin)
November 10, 2016 Filing 75 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chad Campbell, Judith B. Jennison, Christina McCullough, and Jared W. Crop - filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
November 10, 2016 Filing 74 Intervenor COMPLAINT - filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit A Part 3)(Balick, Steven)
November 9, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Craig R. Kaufman for Acer Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig Kaufman filed by Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/8/2016. (mdb)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - The Markman Hearing (full day) is RESCHEDULED for Wednesday, May 3, 2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4A. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/8/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01126-GMS et al.(mdb)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SO ORDERED - re (62 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 64 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 63 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 69 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 63 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 67 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 68 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order permitting Intervention by Microsoft Corporation in certain actions and adjusting the case schedule in all actions. (Claim Construction Opening Briefs due by 3/3/2017., Claim Construction Answering Briefs due by 3/31/2017). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/8/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
November 7, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS INITIAL IDENTIFICATION OF PROSPECTIVE INTERVENOR MICROSOFTS ACCUSED PRODUCTS filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
November 7, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intervenor Microsoft Corporation's Initial Disclosures filed by Microsoft Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
November 7, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
November 4, 2016 Filing 69 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order permitting Intervention by Microsoft Corporation in certain actions and adjusting the case schedule in all actions by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Balick, Steven)
November 4, 2016 Filing 68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig Kaufman - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
October 28, 2016 Filing 67 Official Transcript of Conference held on 10 20 16 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2017. (kjm)
October 28, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer's Third Party Subpoena to International Business Machines Corporation filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
October 27, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-2) re (53 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Notice of Service, (53 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Notice of Service, (49 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Notice of Service, (50 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) Notice of Service filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Smyth, Benjamin)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - The defendants HTC Corp. and HTC America, Inc. 's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation are granted leave to amend their complaint in order to correct the pleading deficiencies regarding the contributory infringement claims dismissed by this order. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/25/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
October 25, 2016 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/25/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
October 20, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Discovery Conference (#1) held on 10/20/2016. Discussion and rulings on the issues outlined in the Joint Agenda Letter. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
October 19, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
October 17, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation (Nos. 1-41) filed by YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp..(Keller, Karen)
October 14, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (54 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 59 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 56 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 54 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 58 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 54 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 53 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
October 12, 2016 Filing 59 Letter to Judge Sleet from Daniel M. Silver regarding conference with Court scheduled for October 20, 2016. (Smyth, Benjamin)
October 7, 2016 Filing 58 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Visual Land, Inc., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Smith, Rodger)
October 4, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Production Under 4(d) of the Court's Default Standard for Discovery, Including Initial Invalidity Contentions and Documents Bearing Bates Numbers PRIORART000001 Through PRIORART029667 filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (52 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 56 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 53 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 53 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 55 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 58 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 52 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit an ESI Protocol to October 7, 2016 filed by ASUSTek Computer Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation, ASUS Computer International. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
September 30, 2016 Filing 56 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit an ESI Protocol to October 7, 2016 - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
September 30, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert S. Pickens for Koninklijke Philips N.V. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(dmp, )
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (52 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 57 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 51 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 55 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 52 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 54 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 51 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert S. Pickens filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/30/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
September 29, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert S. Pickens - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Robert S. Pickens)(Smyth, Benjamin)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (54 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 50 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 51 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 51 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 56 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 52 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 50 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to submit an ESI Protocol to September 30, 2016 filed by Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., ASUSTek Computer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Visual Land, Inc., Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation, ASUS Computer International, Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Southern Telecom Inc., HTC America, Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., HTC Corp. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/26/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
September 23, 2016 Filing 54 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to submit an ESI Protocol to September 30, 2016 - filed by Visual Land, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Smith, Rodger)
September 23, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V. and U.S. Philips Corporation (Nos. 1-2) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SCHEDULING A DISCOVERY HEARING: A Discovery (#1) Hearing is set in these related matters for Thursday, October 20, 2016, at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet. A Joint Agenda Letter (see court website for sample) shall be filed NO LATER THAN noon on Wednesday, October 12, 2016. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/22/16. (ctd)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (48 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 49 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 49 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 55 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 51 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 50 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 52 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to submit an ESI Protocol to September 23, 2016 filed by Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., ASUSTek Computer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Visual Land, Inc., Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation, ASUS Computer International, Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Southern Telecom Inc., HTC America, Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., HTC Corp. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/19/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
September 16, 2016 Filing 52 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to submit an ESI Protocol to September 23, 2016 - filed by Visual Land, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Smith, Rodger)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORAL ORDER: On or before October 6, 2016, each party or each party group shall email to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information requested in the attached Order. Ordered by Judge Thynge on 9/15/16. (Attachments: #1 Order Requesting Information re: ADR) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(cak)
September 15, 2016 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(cak)
September 15, 2016 Filing 50 Official Transcript of Conference held on 09 06 16 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2016. (kjm)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (48 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 44 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 45 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 52 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 49 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 46 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 47 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) Proposed Scheduling Order: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. (Motions for Joinder of Parties and to Amend Pleadings due by 1/9/2017., Claim Construction Opening Brief(s) due by 2/17/2017., Claim Construction Answering Brief(s) due by 3/17/2017., A Markman Hearing (full day) is set for 4/24/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4A., Fact Discovery completed by 9/25/2017., Opening Expert Reports due by 10/20/2017., Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 11/30/2017., Expert Discovery due by 1/26/2018., Opening SJ Letters due by 2/2/2018., Answering Letters due 2/16/2018., Reply Letters due 2/23/2018., A Trial Planning Conference is set for 4/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2018., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A., A 10-day Jury Trial is set for 6/18/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A). Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (46 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 48 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 45 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 43 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 51 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 44 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to September 16, 2016 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation, (47 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to September 16, 2016 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/13/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
September 12, 2016 Filing 49 PROPOSED ORDER -- Proposed Scheduling Order (following Rule 16 Conference) by U.S. Philips Corporation, Koninklijke Philips N.V.. (Silver, Daniel)
September 9, 2016 Filing 48 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to September 16, 2016 - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (41 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 43 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 49 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 45 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 42 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 44 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 46 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to September 9, 2016 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/7/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
September 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Scheduling Conference held on 9/6/2016. A Markman Hearing (full day) is set for 4/24/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4A; a Trial Planning Conference is set for 4/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A; the Proposed Final Pretrial Order is due by the close of business on 5/11/2018; the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A; a 10-day Jury Trial is set for 6/18/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4A. The plaintiffs shall file an amended proposed scheduling order by 9/12/2016. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
September 6, 2016 Filing 47 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Rodger D. Smith II regarding the parties status of two scheduling dispute issues in anticipation of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (Smith, Rodger)
September 6, 2016 Filing 46 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to September 9, 2016 - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 29, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Contentions Against the Defendant Groups and (2) Plaintiffs' First Amended Identification of the Accused Products filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (47 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 40 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 41 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 44 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 42 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 43 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 39 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to August 30, 2016 (from August 25, 2016) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
August 25, 2016 Filing 44 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to August 30, 2016 (from August 25, 2016) - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 22, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer Defendants' Supplemental Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and D. Del.'s Default Standard for Discovery Section 3(a) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Smith, Rodger)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (46 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 38 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 40 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 42 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 42 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 41 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 39 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME a Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to August 25, 2016 (from August 18, 2016) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/22/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
August 18, 2016 Filing 42 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME a Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to August 25, 2016 (from August 18, 2016) - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (41 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 37 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 39 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 41 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 45 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to August 18, 2016 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(asw)
August 11, 2016 Filing 41 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to August 18, 2016 - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (36 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 38 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 44 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 40 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 40 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 39 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 37 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Parties to Submit a Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to August 11, 2016 (from August 4, 2016) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/8/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
August 4, 2016 Filing 40 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Parties to Submit a Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to August 11, 2016 (from August 4, 2016) - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (37 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 43 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 35 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 37 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 39 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 38 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 36 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to Thursday, August 4, 2016 (from Thursday, July 21, 2016) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/25/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
July 21, 2016 Filing 39 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to Thursday, August 4, 2016 (from Thursday, July 21, 2016) - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER CANCELLING THE TELECONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING A HEARING: The Teleconference with the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet currently set in these related matters for Friday, July 22, 2016, at 9:30 AM to discuss the proposed schedule HAS BEEN CANCELLED and an in-court Hearing has been scheduled for Tuesday, September 6, 2016, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/21/2016. (ctd)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (42 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 35 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 36 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 34 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 37 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 36 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 38 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Proposed Protective Order to July 21, 2016 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/21/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
July 20, 2016 Filing 38 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Proposed Protective Order to July 21, 2016 - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (34 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 37 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 36 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 33 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 35 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 35 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 41 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Parties to Submit a Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to July 20, 2016 (from July 15, 2016) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(asw)
July 15, 2016 Filing 37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Parties to Submit a Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to July 20, 2016 (from July 15, 2016) - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Smyth, Benjamin)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SCHEDULING A TELECONFERENCE: A Teleconference with the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet has been set in these related matters for Friday, July 22, 2016, at 9:30 AM to discuss the proposed schedule. Counsel for plaintiff(s) is directed to arrange the teleconference and contact chambers at (302) 573-4559 once all the participants are on the line. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/6/2016. (ctd)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (34 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 36 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 40 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 34 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 34 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 32 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 33 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to July 15, 2016 (from July 1, 2016) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/30/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
June 29, 2016 Filing 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order and ESI Protocol to July 15, 2016 (from July 1, 2016) - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Smyth, Benjamin)
June 24, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Acer Defendants Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A)(1) and D. Del.s Default Standard for Discovery Section 3(A) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Tennyson, Eleanor)
June 22, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendants' Respective Motions to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Visual Land, Inc., ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., YiFang USA, Inc., Southern Telecom Inc., Double Power Technology, Inc., Shenzen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corp. re (12 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , (17 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue [Double Power Technology, Inc., Zowee Marketing Co., Ltd. and Shenzhen Zowee Technology Co., Ltd.'s Joinder in the Joint Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue], (13 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , (9 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , (11 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , (12 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , (12 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue (Pascale, Karen)
June 21, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick Shields, Matthew M. Warren, Erika Mayo, Brian P. Wikner for Acer America Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cna)
June 17, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26 and D. Del. Default Standard Paragraph 3 and (2) Plaintiffs D. Del. Default Standard Paragraoph 4(a) Disclosure of Accused Products to Each Defendant Group filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
June 16, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE of Joinder in HTC's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. (Smith, Rodger)
May 26, 2016 Filing 31 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/6/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Silver, Daniel)
May 13, 2016 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 13, 2016 Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (26 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 28 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 26 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 26 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 24 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 25 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 28 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Answering and Reply Briefs regarding Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants to (see stipulation for details) (Answering Briefs due 5/26/2016., Reply Briefs due 6/16/2016.). Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/13/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (25 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 23 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 25 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 24 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 25 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 26 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 27 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a Joint Status Report to Friday, May 13, 2016 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
May 12, 2016 Filing 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Answering and Reply Briefs regarding Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants to (see stipulation for details) - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Smyth, Benjamin)
May 11, 2016 Filing 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a Joint Status Report to Friday, May 13, 2016 - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Smyth, Benjamin)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (22 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 24 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 24 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 23 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 24 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 25 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 26 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS) Stipulation to Extend Time to May 11, 2016 to File Joint Status Reports and Proposed Order filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/10/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
May 5, 2016 Filing 26 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Joint Status Reports and Proposed Order by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 5/5/2016 (mdb).
April 29, 2016 Filing 25 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Daniel M. Silver regarding Federal Circuit's decision. (Attachments: #1 Federal Circuit's decision in In re TC Heartland, LLC)(Silver, Daniel)
April 28, 2016 Filing 24 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/16/2016. (Smith, Rodger) Modified on 4/28/2016 (mdb).
April 28, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Smith, Rodger) Modified on 4/28/2016 (mdb).
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew Warren, Patrick Shields, Brian Wikner and Erika Mayo filed by Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/28/2016. (mdb)
April 27, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew Warren, Patrick Shields, Brian Wikner and Erika Mayo - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
April 21, 2016 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
April 11, 2016 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2016 (mdb).
April 11, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/21/2016. (Silver, Daniel)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (18 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 18 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 15 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS, 18 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 16 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 18 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 14 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference and submit a Joint Status Report to May 5, 2016 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/6/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
April 5, 2016 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference and submit a Joint Status Report to May 5, 2016 - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (16 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 17 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 17 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 17 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 13 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 15 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 14 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file First Amended Complaints in response to Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motions To Dismiss and to file Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Improper Venue to April 11, 2016 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01170-GMS et al.(mdb)
March 29, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Hsiang James H. Lin, Kai Tseng for Acer Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cna)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kai Tseng and Hsiang (James) H. Lin filed by Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/28/2016. (mdb)
March 24, 2016 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file First Amended Complaints in response to Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motions To Dismiss and to file Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Improper Venue to April 11, 2016 - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
March 23, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kai Tseng and Hsiang (James) H. Lin - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(asw)
March 11, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael P. Sandonato, Daniel A. Apgar, Jonathan M. Sharret, John D. Carlin for Koninklijke Philips N.V. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(klc)
March 8, 2016 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Acer Inc., Other Affiliate Gateway, Inc. for Acer America Corporation; Other Affiliate Gateway, Inc., Other Affiliate Acer American Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Boardwalk Capital Holdings Limited for Acer Inc. filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
March 8, 2016 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Rodger)
March 8, 2016 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Smith, Rodger)
March 8, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Derek S. Neilson,Michael J. Newton,Sang (Michael) Lee,Patrick J. Flinn,Xavier M. Brandwajn,Ross R. Barton for ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Acer America Corporation and Acer Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 1:15-cv-01170-GMS(klc)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Newton, Patrick J. Flinn, Ross Barton, Derek Neilson, Sang (Michael) Lee and Xavier Brandwajn filed by Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/11/2016. (mdb)
February 9, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Newton, Patrick J. Flinn, Ross Barton, Derek Neilson, Sang (Michael) Lee and Xavier Brandwajn - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to March 8, 2016 filed by Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Acer America Corporation answer due 3/8/2016; Acer Inc. answer due 3/8/2016. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/27/2016. (mdb)
January 26, 2016 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to March 8, 2016 - filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (7 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 7 in 1:15-cv-01129-GMS, 6 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 7 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 8 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 8 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 8 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 6 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Sandonato, John D. Carlin, Daniel A. Apgar and Jonathan M. Sharret filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb)
December 23, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 22, 2015 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Acer America Corporation made on December 21, 2015 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smyth, Benjamin) Modified on 1/27/2016 (mdb).
December 22, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Sandonato, John D. Carlin, Daniel A. Apgar and Jonathan M. Sharret - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Smyth, Benjamin)
December 18, 2015 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Acer America Corporation on 12/18/2015; Acer Inc. on 12/18/2015. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
December 18, 2015 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Philips Holdings USA for U.S. Philips Corporation filed by U.S. Philips Corporation. (sar)
December 18, 2015 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V.. (sar)
December 18, 2015 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,522,695; RE44,006; 8,543,819; 6,772,114; RE43,564;. (sar)
December 18, 2015 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE44,913; 6,690,387; 7,184,064; 7,529,806; 5,910,797;. (sar)
December 18, 2015 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1846913.) - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6-10, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al v. Acer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Christina J McCullough
Represented By: Jared W. Crop
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Microsoft Mobile Oy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Microsoft Mobile Inc.
Represented By: Jared W. Crop
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: Christina J McCullough
Represented By: Patrick J. McKeever
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Philips Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin A. Smyth
Represented By: Joyce L. Nadipuram
Represented By: Daniel A. Apgar
Represented By: Natalie Lieber
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sharret
Represented By: Sean M. McCarthy
Represented By: Michael P. Sandonato
Represented By: Michael P Kelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Caitlyn N. Bingaman
Represented By: Robert Scott Pickens
Represented By: Lori L. Holland
Represented By: Ethan Isaac Jacobs
Represented By: Natalie D Lieber,
Represented By: Julian G. Pymento
Represented By: Joyce L. Nadipuram,
Represented By: Sean M. McCarthy,
Represented By: Caitlyn N. Bingaman,
Represented By: Christopher M. Gerson
Represented By: Christopher T. Holland
Represented By: Jaime F. Cardenas-Navia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Represented By: Benjamin A. Smyth
Represented By: Daniel A. Apgar
Represented By: Robert S. Pickens
Represented By: Joyce L. Nadipuram
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sharret
Represented By: Jaime F Cardenas-Navia
Represented By: Nicole Yvonne Stoddard
Represented By: Natalie Lieber
Represented By: Sean M. McCarthy
Represented By: Michael P Kelly
Represented By: Michael P. Sandonato
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Julian G. Pymento
Represented By: Christopher M. Gerson
Represented By: Caitlyn N. Bingaman
Represented By: John D. Carlin
Represented By: Michael P. Sandonato,
Represented By: Julian G. Pymento,
Represented By: Lori L. Holland
Represented By: Ethan Isaac Jacobs
Represented By: Jaime F. Cardenas-Navia,
Represented By: Natalie D Lieber,
Represented By: Joyce L. Nadipuram,
Represented By: Christopher M. Gerson,
Represented By: Sean M. McCarthy,
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Robert Scott Pickens,
Represented By: Caitlyn N. Bingaman,
Represented By: Daniel A. Apgar,
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sharret,
Represented By: Christopher T. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Inc.
Represented By: Hsiang James H Lin
Represented By: Kai Tseng
Represented By: Ross R. Barton
Represented By: Craig R. Kaufman
Represented By: Michael J Newton
Represented By: Patrick J. Flinn
Represented By: Eleanor Gail Tennyson
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Xavier M. Brandwajn
Represented By: Sang (Michael) Lee
Represented By: Derek S. Neilson
Represented By: Patrick M. Shields
Represented By: Matthew S. Warren
Represented By: Kyle Thomason
Represented By: Bruce R Genderson
Represented By: Amy Marie Bailey
Represented By: Kaiwen Tseng
Represented By: Christopher Alan Suarez,
Represented By: Kevin Hardy
Represented By: Erika H. Warren
Represented By: Aaron P Maurer
Represented By: Sanjiv Prakash Laud
Represented By: Christopher Scott Geyer
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer America Corporation
Represented By: Ross R. Barton
Represented By: Brian P. Wikner
Represented By: Matthew Warren
Represented By: Michael J Newton
Represented By: Patrick J. Flinn
Represented By: Eleanor Gail Tennyson
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Xavier M. Brandwajn
Represented By: Sang (Michael) Lee
Represented By: Erika Mayo
Represented By: Patrick Shields
Represented By: Derek S. Neilson
Represented By: Patrick M. Shields
Represented By: Craig R. Kaufman
Represented By: Matthew S. Warren
Represented By: Kyle Thomason
Represented By: Bruce R Genderson
Represented By: Amy Marie Bailey
Represented By: Kaiwen Tseng
Represented By: Christopher Alan Suarez,
Represented By: Kevin Hardy
Represented By: Erika H. Warren
Represented By: Aaron P Maurer
Represented By: Hsiang James H Lin
Represented By: Sanjiv Prakash Laud
Represented By: Christopher Scott Geyer
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?