City and County of San Francisco v. Sessions et al Featured Case

The city of San Francisco sued Attorney General Jeff Sessions over his recission of a large number of Department of Justice guidance documents that were designed to protect the civil rights of the indigent, people of color, and people with disabilities. The lawsuit alleges that the decision to rescind the guidance documents was arbitrary and capricious, in violation of federal law.

Plaintiff: City and County of San Francisco
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions, III and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 4:2018cv02068
Filed: April 5, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 37 NOTICE of Change of Address by Cesar A. Lopez-Morales (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 27, 2018 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/25/2018. Replies due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- AG Memo, # 2 Exhibit B- July Press Release, # 3 Exhibit C- December Press Release, # 4 Exhibit D- Baudry Letter, # 5 Exhibit E- Refugee Employment Flyer, # 6 Exhibit F- New Joint Guidance on I-9 Audits, # 7 Exhibit G- New Employers' Flyer, # 8 Exhibit H- New Refugees' Flyer, # 9 Exhibit I- Prior Joint Statement, # 10 Exhibit J- New Joint Statement)(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 24, 2018 35 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by United States Department of Justice, Jefferson B. Sessions, III. Responses due by 10/25/2018. Replies due by 11/13/2018. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 24, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 20, 2018 34 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice. (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 19, 2018 33 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 9/18/2018 by Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 27, 2018 32 NOTICE filed by City and County of San Francisco of Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 1, 2018 31 CLERK'S NOTICE TERMINATING MOTION AS MOOT re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Plaintiff has filed an 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT. The pending motion to dismiss is terminated as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 30, 2018 30 First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice. Filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Herrera, Dennis) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 20, 2018 29 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 7/19/2018 by Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 9/18/2018, at 10:00 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 13, 2018 28 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 7/25/2018 is continued to 12/19/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. A Joint Case Management Statement is due 12/10/2018 by 5:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 10, 2018 27 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 10, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 26 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
June 28, 2018 25 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 28, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 27, 2018 24 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on July 19, 2018 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 22 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 19, 2018 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Due to a change in the Court's availability, the Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2018 is continued to 8/16/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. The briefing schedule is unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
June 18, 2018 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 7/2/2018. Replies due by 7/9/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- AG Memo, # 2 Exhibit B- Rescission Press Release, # 3 Exhibit C- Zendejas Letter, # 4 Exhibit D- Baudry Letter, # 5 Exhibit E- Prior Joint Statement)(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 15, 2018 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 14, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 13, 2018 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 13, 2018 Electronic filing error. Re: 13 Notice of Appearance filed by United States Department of Justice, Jefferson B. Sessions, III. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instruct ed that all future filings shall bear the initials DMR immediately after the case number. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 12, 2018 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice.. (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 12, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cesar A. Lopez-Morales on behalf of Defendants (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
May 24, 2018 12 Updated Proof of Service by City and County of San Francisco (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 5/24/2018) Modified on 5/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2018 11 Proof of Service by City and County of San Francisco (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 4/20/2018) Modified on 4/23/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2018 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City and County of San Francisco.. (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 6, 2018 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 8 Summons Issued as to Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice, and U.S. Attorney General. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018) Modified on 4/9/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mollie M Lee Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Lee, Mollie) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Jennifer Eisenberg Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne Rosil Mere Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Mere, Yvonne) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald P. Flynn Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Herrera, Dennis) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12248551.). Filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrera, Dennis) (Filed on 4/5/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City and County of San Francisco v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Sara Jennifer Eisenberg
Represented By: Ronald P. Flynn
Represented By: Dennis J. Herrera
Represented By: Mollie M Lee
Represented By: Yvonne Rosil Mere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?